EP3422226 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING AN UNFOLDED STATE OF A FOLDABLE IMPLANT IN CARDIOVASCULAR TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WISSEL, Tobias c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standard High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MORALES VARELA, Hernán Guillermo c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standard High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
GRASS, Michael c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standard High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/01] | Application number, filing date | 17305824.9 | 29.06.2017 | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3422226 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, A61B8/08 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B90/37 (US);
A61F2/2427 (US);
G06T19/20 (EP,US);
G06T7/149 (US);
G06T7/33 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (US);
G16H30/40 (US);
A61B2034/104 (US);
A61B2090/363 (US);
A61B2090/364 (US);
A61B8/0883 (EP);
A61M2025/0166 (US);
G06T2207/10081 (EP);
G06T2207/30048 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30056 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE EINES ENTFALTETEN ZUSTANDS EINES FALTBAREN IMPLANTATS IN KARDIOVASKULÄREM GEWEBE | [2019/01] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING AN UNFOLDED STATE OF A FOLDABLE IMPLANT IN CARDIOVASCULAR TISSUE | [2019/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION D'UN ÉTAT DÉPLIÉ D'UN IMPLANT PLIABLE DANS UN TISSU CARDIOVASCULAIRE | [2019/01] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 17.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013259341 (MOUNTNEY PETER [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0111] *; | [I]US2013294667 (ZHENG YEFENG [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US2015112659 (MORTIER PETER [BE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0148] *; | [A]US2016128786 (WEBER FRANK MICHAEL [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0059] * |