EP3460400 - IMPROVED LOCALIZATION OF A MOBILE DEVICE BASED ON IMAGE AND RADIO WORDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Softbank Robotics Europe 43, rue du Colonel Pierre Avia 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states ARMINES 60, Boulevard Saint Michel 75272 Paris Cedex 06 / FR | [2021/47] |
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states Softbank Robotics Europe 43 rue du Colonel Pierre Avia 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states ARMINES 60, Boulevard Saint Michel 75272 Paris Cedex 06 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOWAKOWSKI, Mathieu c/o ARMINES 60, Boulevard Saint Michel 75272 Paris Cedex 06 / FR | 02 /
JOLY, Cyril c/o ARMINES 60, Boulevard Saint Michel 75272 Paris Cedex 06 / FR | 03 /
FRES, Scarlett c/o SOFTBANK ROBOTICS EUROPE 43, rue du Colonel Pierre Avia 75015 Paris / FR | 04 /
GARCIA, Nicolas c/o SOFTBANK ROBOTICS EUROPE 43, rue du Colonel Pierre Avia 75015 Paris / FR | 05 /
MOUTARDE, Fabien c/o ARMINES 60, Boulevard Saint Michel 75272 Paris Cedex 06 / FR | [2021/47] |
Former [2019/13] | 01 /
NOWAKOWSKI, Mathieu c/o ARMINES 60 Boulevard Saint Michel 75272 PARIS Cedex 06 / FR | ||
02 /
JOLY, Cyril c/o ARMINES 60 Boulevard Saint Michel 75272 PARIS Cedex 06 / FR | |||
03 /
FRES, Scarlett c/o SOFTBANK ROBOTICS EUROPE 43 rue du Colonel Pierre Avia 75015 PARIS / FR | |||
04 /
GARCIA, Nicolas c/o SOFTBANK ROBOTICS EUROPE 43 rue du Colonel Pierre Avia 75015 PARIS / FR | |||
05 /
MOUTARDE, Fabien c/o ARMINES 60 Boulevard Saint Michel 75272 PARIS Cedex 06 / FR | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2019/13] | Bell, Mark Marks & Clerk France Immeuble «Visium» 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17306252.2 | 22.09.2017 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3460400 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3460400 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G01C21/206 (EP,KR);
H04W4/029 (US);
G01S5/0252 (KR,US);
H04W4/024 (US);
H04W4/30 (US);
H04W4/33 (US);
H04W64/003 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] |
Former [2019/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ORTUNG EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG AUF BASIS VON BILDERN UND FUNKWÖRTERN | [2019/13] | English: | IMPROVED LOCALIZATION OF A MOBILE DEVICE BASED ON IMAGE AND RADIO WORDS | [2019/13] | French: | LOCALISATION AMÉLIORÉE D'UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE SUR LA BASE DES MOTS IMAGE ET RADIO | [2019/13] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 26.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2017 | AL | 22.12.2021 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | ES | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | IT | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | MT | 22.12.2021 | PL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SE | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | IE | 22.09.2022 | LU | 22.09.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 22.09.2017 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
IE | 22.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 22.09.2017 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
IE | 22.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.09.2017 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
IE | 22.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
IE | 22.09.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
LU | 22.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011144968 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1-12 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0 25] , [0 39] - [0045] - [0 60] , [0 61] , [0 68] , [0 81] * * claims 1-25 *; | [XDYI] - QUIGLEY M ET AL, "Sub-meter indoor localization in unmodified environments with inexpensive sensors", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS (IROS), 2010 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101018), doi:10.1109/IROS.2010.5651783, ISBN 978-1-4244-6674-0, pages 2039 - 2046, XP031920707 [XD] 1,5,11,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1-12 * * I. Introduction * * p.2041-2042, C. Camera Sensor Model * * p.2042-2043, WiFi Sensor Model * * p.2043-2044, E. Localization * [Y] 2-4,8-10,12,13 [I] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2010.5651783 | [YD] - M. CUMMINS ET AL, "FAB-MAP: Probabilistic Localization and Mapping in the Space of Appearance", THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ROBOTICS RESEARCH, (20080601), vol. 27, no. 6, doi:10.1177/0278364908090961, ISSN 0278-3649, pages 647 - 665, XP055066085 [YD] 2-4,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1-13 * * p. 649-654, 3. Approximating High-dimensional Discrete Distributions * * 4. Probabilistic Navigation using Appearance * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0278364908090961 | [A] - JAN WIETRZYKOWSKI ET AL, "Adopting the FAB-MAP algorithm for indoor localization with WiFi fingerprints", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20161107), XP080729876 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * 1. Introduction * * 3. Adopting FAB-MAP to WiFi features * | by applicant | - CUMMINS, M.; NEWMAN, P., "FAB-MAP: Probabilistic localization and mapping in the space of appearance", The International Journal of Robotics Research, (20080000), vol. 27, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1177/0278364908090961, pages 647 - 665, XP055066085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0278364908090961 | - CUMMINS, M.; NEWMAN, P., "Appearance-only SLAM at large scale with FAB-MAP 2.0", The International Journal of Robotics Research, (20110000), vol. 30, no. 9, pages 1100 - 1123 | - "Video Google: A text retrieval approach to object matching in videos", SIVIC, J.; ZISSERMAN, A., Computer Vision, 2003. Proceedings. Ninth IEEE International Conference, IEEE, (20031000), page 1470 | - "Localization based on fusion of rfid and stereo image data", SCHWIEGELSHOHN, F.; NICK, T.; GOTZE, J., Positioning Navigation and Communication (WPNC), 2013 10th Workshop, IEEE, (20130300), pages 1 - 6 | - "Sub-meter indoor localization in unmodified environments with inexpensive sensors", QUIGLEY, M.; STAVENS, D.; COATES, A.; THRUN, S., In Intelligent Robots and Systems (IROS), 2010 IEEE/RSJ International Conference, IEEE, (20101000), pages 2039 - 2046 | - NOWICKI, M., "WiFi-guided visual loop closure for indoor navigation using mobile devices", Journal of Automation Mobile Robotics and Intelligent Systems, (20140000), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 10 - 18 | - "Multi-sensor mobile robot localization for diverse environments", BISWAS, J.; VELOSO, M., Robot Soccer World Cup, Springer, (20130600), pages 468 - 479 | - "Video Google: A text retrieval approach to object matching in videos", SIVIC, J.; ZISSERMAN, A., In null, IEEE, (20031000), page 1470 | - SIVIC, J.; ZISSERMAN, A., "Video Google: A text retrieval approach to object matching in videos", In Computer Vision, 2003. Proceedings Ninth IEEE International Conference on IEEE, (20031000), doi:doi:10.1109/ICCV.2003.1238663, pages 1470 - 1477, XP010662565 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2003.1238663 | - The International Journal of Robotics Research, vol. 27, no. 6, pages 647 - 665 | EP20140305848 | EP20140305849 |