Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
05.12.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.10.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.04.2019 | Change - applicant | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
01.03.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
13.10.2017 | Change - representative |