Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020214926 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76717 | 02.10.2018 | EP17306314 | 02.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102595038B | Global Dossier | 27.10.2023 | B1 | KR20200064982 | 08.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76717 | 02.10.2018 | EP17306314 | 02.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020536268 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76717 | 02.10.2018 | EP17306314 | 02.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3691514 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76717 | 02.10.2018 | EP17306314 | 02.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111163680B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2022 | B | CN111163680 | 15.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76717 | 02.10.2018 | EP17306314 | 02.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3074626 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76717 | 02.10.2018 | EP17306314 | 02.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112020005493 | 29.09.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76717 | 02.10.2018 | EP17306314 | 02.10.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019068671 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17306314 | 02.10.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3461394 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17306314 | 02.10.2017 |