EP3470050 - USE OF CALCINED KAOLIN AS A MATTIFYING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMERTECH SAS 43, quai de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAGIS, Laure 61 rue Lucien Cassagne 31500 Toulouse / FR | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17306362.9 | 10.10.2017 | [2019/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3470050 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/26, A61Q1/12, A61Q19/00, A61K8/02, A61K8/04, A61Q1/00 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
A61K8/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/022 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/042 (EP,KR);
A61Q1/00 (EP,KR);
A61Q1/02 (US);
A61Q1/12 (EP,KR);
A61Q19/008 (EP,KR);
C09C1/42 (US);
A61K2800/26 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON KALZINIERTEM KAOLIN ALS MATTIERUNGSMITTEL | [2019/16] | English: | USE OF CALCINED KAOLIN AS A MATTIFYING AGENT | [2019/16] | French: | UTILISATION DE LA KAOLIN CALCINÉE COMME AGENT MATIFIANT | [2019/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0060088 (INDIANA UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION [US]); | [XY]JPS57169412 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [X]EP0102695 (INDIANA UNIVERSITY FOUNDATION [US]); | [X]US5030445 (HASHIMOTO SHIGERU [JP], et al); | [A]WO2004085336 (IMERYS KAOLIN INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013160362 (OREAL [FR]); | [E]WO2017174756 (IMERYS MINERALS LTD [GB]) | by applicant | EP0799021 | WO9924360 | US6136740 | EP1106164 | US6334894 |