EP3486818 - A METHOD FOR IMPROVING USER AUTHENTICATION PERFORMED BY A COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEMALTO SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAURE, Frédéric C/O Gemalto SA, Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Cassagne, Philippe M.J., et al Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Cassagne, Philippe M.J., et al Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17306601.0 | 17.11.2017 | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3486818 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/31, G06F21/32, H04L29/06, H04W12/06, G06N3/08 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
G06F21/31 (EP);
H04L63/0861 (EP,US);
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/088 (EP);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04W12/065 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER VON EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG DURCHGEFÜHRTEN BENUTZERAUTHENTIFIZIERUNG | [2019/21] | English: | A METHOD FOR IMPROVING USER AUTHENTICATION PERFORMED BY A COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2019/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À AMÉLIORER L'AUTHENTIFICATION DE L'UTILISATEUR EFFECTUÉE PAR UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2019/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/18] | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014188770 (AGRAFIOTI FOTEINI [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1,7-9,10,12 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0158] - paragraph [0160] *; | [A]WO2017176356 (UNIV RICE WILLIAM M [US]) [A] 1-13 * figures 1A,1B,1C, 3B * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] ** claims 1-8 * |