Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12044543 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2024 | B2 | US2020340823 | 29.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP85944 | 19.12.2018 | EP17306946 | 28.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111886628 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP85944 | 19.12.2018 | EP17306946 | 28.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019129583 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17306946 | 28.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3506207 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17306946 | 28.12.2017 |