EP3498923 - FIXING MEANS FOR FIXING A WEAR ELEMENT ON THE FRONT EDGE OF A SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metalogenia Research & Technologies S.L. Àvila 45 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rol Corredor, Javier Metalogenia Research & Technologies S.L. Av. Corts Catalanes No. 28, 9eno 3ra 08930 Sant Adrià del Besòs / ES | 02 /
Pérez Soria, Francisco Metalogenia Research & Technologies S.L. Cadí 18 08430 La Roca del Vallès / ES | 03 /
Triginer Boixeda, Jorge Metalogenia Research & Technologies S.L. Drecera de Vallvidrera, 50 08017 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
Martínez Mañé, Angel Metalogenia Research & Technologies S.L. Passatge Angeleta Ferrer No. 3, Escala C, 3° 1ª 08303 Mataró / ES | 05 /
López Requejo, Sergio Metalogenia Research & Technologies S.L. Rda. Països Catalans 34-36, 5è 3ra 08304 Mataró / ES | 06 /
Amat Holgado, Carlos Metalogenia Research & Technologies S.L. Passatge dels Roures 1, bx 6 08338 Premià de Dalt / ES | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Curell Suñol S.L.P. Muntaner 240, 4º 2ª 08021 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | Curell Suñol S.L.P. Via Augusta 21 08006 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 17380027.7 | 13.12.2017 | [2019/25] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3498923 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
E02F9/2833 (EP,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSMITTEL ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES VERSCHLEISSELEMENTS AN DER VORDERKANTE EINES TRÄGERS | [2019/25] | English: | FIXING MEANS FOR FIXING A WEAR ELEMENT ON THE FRONT EDGE OF A SUPPORT | [2019/25] | French: | MOYENS DE FIXATION PERMETTANT DE FIXER UN ÉLÉMENT D'USURE SUR LE BORD AVANT D'UN SUPPORT | [2019/25] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/25] | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/36] | 22.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 12.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 12.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4433496 (JONES LARREN F [US], et al); | [A]AU716828B (ANI CORP LTD); | [Y]CA2316712 (SMORGON STEEL GROUP LTD [AU], et al); | [A]US2015096207 (TASOVSKI VASIL S [US]) | by applicant | WO0020696 |