EP3499662 - ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING A SUBMARINE LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fundación Tecnalia Research & Innovation Parque Cientifico y Tecnologico de Gipuzkoa Paseo de Mikeletegi Pasealekua, 2 20009 Donostia-San Sebastian, Guipuzcoa / ES | [2019/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rico Rubio, Antonio Parque Tecnológico de Bizkaia c/ Geldo, edificio 700 48160 Derio Bizkaia / ES | 02 /
Berque, Joannes Parque Tecnológico de Bizkaia c/ Geldo, edificio 700 48160 Derio Bizkaia / ES | 03 /
Sellner, Jan Parque Tecnológico de Bizkaia c/ Geldo, edificio 700 48160 Derio Bizkaia / ES | 04 /
Nava, Vincenzo BCAM Basque Center for Applied Mathematics Alameda de Mazarredo, 14 Basque Country 48009 Bilbao / ES | 05 /
Villate Martínez, José Luis Parque Tecnológico de Bizkaia c/ Geldo, edificio 700 48160 Derio Bizkaia / ES | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 93 5ª planta 28046 Madrid / ES | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 17380029.3 | 13.12.2017 | [2019/25] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3499662 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/10, E02F5/10, B63B35/04, F03D80/80 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
E02F5/104 (EP);
E02F3/8866 (EP);
E02F5/105 (EP);
H02G1/10 (EP);
H02G9/02 (EP);
B63B35/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INSTALLATION EINER UNTERWASSERLEITUNG | [2019/25] | English: | ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING A SUBMARINE LINE | [2019/25] | French: | ENSEMBLE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INSTALLER UNE LIGNE SOUS-MARINE | [2019/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/34] | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2704276 (STRABAG OFFSHORE WIND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,6-10,12,14 * paragraph [0019]; figures 1,10 *; | [Y]WO0121479 (COFLEXIP [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6-10,12,14 * page 15, line 1 - line 13; figures 1A,1B *; | [A]US5971665 (HUGHES E WAYNE [US]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]US2002172562 (WORMAN PETER JOHNSON [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]EP2518310 (FUNDACION TECNALIA RES & INNOVATION [ES]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2012007790 | US3434297 |