EP3385697 - SAMPLE HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raman Health Technologies, S.L Avenida Francisco Valles, 8 47151 Boecillo / ES | [2018/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATALÁ ESPÍ, Alejandro RAMAN HEALTH TECHNOLOGIES, S.L. Avenida Francisco Vallés, 8 E-47151 Boecillo, Valladolid / ES | 02 /
VENEGAS DEL VALLE, Gloria RAMAN HEALTH TECHNOLOGIES, S.L. Avenida Francisco Vallés, 8 E-47151 Boecillo, Valladolid / ES | 03 /
ZANOTTI, Carlo RAMAN HEALTH TECHNOLOGIES, S.L. Avenida Francisco Vallés, 8 E-47151 Boecillo, Valladolid / ES | [2018/41] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/41] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17382176.0 | 04.04.2017 | [2018/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3385697 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, G01N21/65, B01L3/00, G01N1/31, // G01N21/03, G01N33/50 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
G01N21/65 (EP);
B01L9/52 (EP);
B01L2200/025 (EP);
B01L2200/141 (EP);
B01L2300/043 (EP);
B01L2300/0609 (EP);
B01L2300/069 (EP);
B01L2300/0887 (EP);
B01L2300/126 (EP);
B01L3/021 (EP);
G01N1/2813 (EP);
G01N2021/035 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENTRÄGER | [2018/41] | English: | SAMPLE HOLDER | [2018/41] | French: | PORTE-ÉCHANTILLONS | [2018/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/39] | 03.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005112034 (MCCORMICK JAMES B [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0034] , [0044] , [0049] * * figures 1,4 *; | [XI]WO9900655 (IMMUNETICS [US]) [X] 1 * page 13, line 31 - page 14, line 14 * * figure 7 * [I] 1; | [Y]CN105223061 (CHANGCHUN BOKIN BIOTECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] , [0006] , [0013] , [0014] , [0016] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5848977 (ZAKIM DAVID S [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 41 - line 47 * * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 12 * * column 6, line 48 - line 51 * * figures 1,2,7 *; | [Y]US2015056606 (PETTER LINDA MARIE [US]) [Y] 6,7 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0050] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5545376 (HONIGS DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013260477 (SMITH MICHAEL JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009105611 (WILKINSON BRADLEY M [US], et al) [A] 2,4,5,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005164402 (BELISLE CHRISTOPHER M [US], et al) [A] 3 * the whole document * | by applicant | US8835128 | EP1271125 |