Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3402044
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.05.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.11.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.07.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.06.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2020 |
First examination report |
|
14.03.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.01.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
24.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.05.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.05.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
17.05.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
11.05.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.10.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
13.05.2017 |
Change - representative |
|