EP3409614 - FLEXIBLE CONTAINER WITH THREE-DIMENSIONAL RANDOM LOOP MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Llc 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIETO, Jesús Autovia Tarragona-Salou S/N 43006 Tarragona Sur / ES | 02 /
ALVAREZ, Eduardo Autovia Tarragona-Salou S/N 43006 Tarragona Sur / ES | 03 /
SANTINI, Luis Alberto Autovia Tarragona-Salou S/N 43006 Tarragona Sur / ES | 04 /
SHAH, Viraj K. 2301 N. Brazosport Blvd. Freeport, TX Texas TX 77541 / US | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/49] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17382316.2 | 31.05.2017 | [2018/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3409614 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/00, B65D75/54 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
B65D75/008 (EP,US);
B65D75/54 (EP);
B65D75/5883 (US);
B65D83/0055 (US);
B65D85/72 (US);
B65D2231/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER BEHÄLTER MIT DREIDIMENSIONALEM ZUFALLSSCHLEIFENMATERIAL | [2018/49] | English: | FLEXIBLE CONTAINER WITH THREE-DIMENSIONAL RANDOM LOOP MATERIAL | [2018/49] | French: | RÉCIPIENT FLEXIBLE COMPORTANT UN MATÉRIAU À BOUCLE ALÉATOIRE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2018/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4381846 (HECK SAMUEL C) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 4; figure 2 *; | [YA]WO8600868 (SCHOLLE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-4 * page 18, lines 9-25; figure 20 * [A] 5; | [A]US2006053749 (SCANLAN GREGORY P [US]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6111023 | US5677383 | US6984695 | US5783638 | US3645992 | US4798081 | US5089321 | US7803728 | - B MONRABAL et al., Macromol. Symp., (20070000), vol. 257, pages 71 - 79 | - WILLIAMS; WARD, J. Polym. Sci., Polym. Let., (19680000), vol. 6, page 621 | - KARJALA, TERESA P.; SAMMLER, ROBERT L.; MANGNUS MARC A.; HAZLITT, LONNIE G.; JOHNSON, MARK S.; HAGEN, CHARLES M., JR.; HUANG, JOE, "Detection of low levels of long-chain branching in polyolefins", Annual Technical Conference — Society of Plastics Engineers, (20080000), vol. 66, pages 887 - 891 |