EP3462003 - HEAT RECOVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BORGWARNER EMISSIONS SYSTEMS SPAIN, S.L.U. Carretera de Zamanes, 20 36315 Vigo Pontevedra / ES | [2019/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCÍA GONZÁLEZ, Salvador Camiño da Cividá, 24 E-36307 Belesar-Baiona, Pontevedra / ES | 02 /
HERMIDA DOMÍNGUEZ, Xoan Xosé Urb. San Benito 18 E-36380 Gondomar - Pontevedra / ES | 03 /
TENIENTE MOLINOS, Jorge Rua San Telmo, 6 E-36320 Chapela-Redondela, Pontevedra / ES | 04 /
LAGO LÓPEZ, David Rúa Martín Codax, 18 E-15142 Arteixo, A Coruña / ES | 05 /
OTERO VÁZQUEZ, Ana Barrio Santa Mariña, 45 E-27500 Chantada - Lugo / ES | 06 /
SOTELO ÁLVAREZ, Anxo Rúa Seixalbo, 48 E-32970 Ourense / ES | [2019/14] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/14] | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17382647.0 | 29.09.2017 | [2019/14] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3462003 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01N5/02 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
F01N5/02 (EP,US);
F02G5/02 (US);
F01P3/18 (US);
F28D7/10 (US);
F28F27/02 (US);
F01N2240/02 (EP,US);
F01N2240/20 (EP,US);
F01N2410/00 (EP,US);
F01N2470/02 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] |
Former [2019/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/14] | English: | HEAT RECOVERY SYSTEM | [2019/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR | [2019/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 02.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011239634 (REYNOLDS MICHAEL G [US]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2803843 (SCAMBIA HOLDINGS CYPRUS LTD [CY]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2015034192 (HOSSFELD HANS-CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [A] 1-16* figures 1-3 *; | [X]FR3031140 (FAURECIA SYSTEMES D'ECHAPPEMENT [FR]) [X] 1-16 * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | WO2014131828 |