15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
25.06.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
04.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
11.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
17.07.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
10.07.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.07.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.07.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.06.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.10.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.10.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
04.10.2019 |
Change - designated states |
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] |
02.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
20.06.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
18.06.2018 |
Change - representative |
|