Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10724893 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2020 | B2 | US2019101433 | 04.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17461616 | 29.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109579947B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2021 | B | CN109579947 | 05.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17461616 | 29.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3018242 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17461616 | 29.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018229439B | Global Dossier | 15.02.2024 | B2 | AU2018229439 | 18.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17461616 | 29.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3462144 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2020 | B1 | EP3462144 | 03.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17461616 | 29.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR102018069869 | 07.02.2023 | B1 | BR102018069869 | 16.04.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP17461616 | 29.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2827289T | 20.05.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP17461616 | 29.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3462144T | 08.02.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP17461616 | 29.09.2017 |