EP3405177 - FORMULATIONS/COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A BTK INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Manish, Kumar c/o Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
KULKARNI, Parikshit, Rameshrao Ratnadeep plot no. 3 Gita housing society Manisha nagar road Pandharpur Maharashtra 413304 / IN | 03 /
KRISHNAN NAIR, Binuraj Maxima D 901 Casa Bella Gold Palava Kalyan Shil Phata Road Dombivali East Maharashtra 421204 / IN | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Purewal, Savroop, et al Janssen Pharmaceutica NV J&J Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 17700820.8 | 18.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017EP50962 | Priority number, date | IN201621001986 | 19.01.2016 Original published format: IN201621001986 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017125423 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3405177 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/48, A61K31/00 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
A61K9/2054 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (US);
A61K9/2009 (KR,US);
A61K9/2013 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2077 (KR);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP,KR);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,KR);
A61P35/04 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Extension states | BA | 20.08.2018 | ME | 20.08.2018 | Validation states | MA | 20.08.2018 | MD | 20.08.2018 | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN/ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM BTK-INHIBITOREN | [2018/48] | English: | FORMULATIONS/COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A BTK INHIBITOR | [2018/48] | French: | FORMULATIONS/COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DE BTK | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 20.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2019 | Observations by third parties | 16.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2021 | Observations by third parties | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2014336203 (SMYTH MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10,11,18-26,30-33,37-49,52-55 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0105] - [0106]; examples 10-11; table 5 * [I] 8,9,12-17,27-29,34-36,50,51; | [A]CN104523695 (GUANGDONG HEC PHARMACEUTICAL) [A] 1-55* the whole document *; | [XP]WO2016022942 (PHARMACYCLICS LLC [US], et al) [XP] 1-7 * paragraphs [0069] - [0084]; claims 1-21; table 8 *; | [XP]WO2016141068 (PHARMACYCLICS LLC [US]) [XP] 1-55 * paragraphs [0056] - [0066]; examples 1-2 * | by applicant | US4327725 | US4624848 | US4968509 | US5323907 | US5456923 | US5461140 | US5516527 | US5622721 | US5686105 | US5700410 | US5977175 | US6326469 | US6465014 | US6932983 | WO2008039218 | US7514444 | US7711492 | - KUROSAKI, CURR OP IMM, (2000), pages 276 - 281 | - SCHAEFFER; SCHWARTZBERG, CURR OP IMM, (2000), pages 282 - 288 | - C. A. JEFFRIES ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 278, pages 26258 - 26264 | - N. J. HORWOOD ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2003), vol. 197, pages 1603 - 1611 | - IWAKI ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 280, no. 48, pages 40261 - 40270 | - VASSILEV ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 274, no. 3, pages 1646 - 1656 | - QUEK ET AL., CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 8, no. 20, pages 1137 - 1140 | - "The Non-Hodgkin's Lymphoma Pathologic Classification Project", CANCER, (1982), vol. 49, pages 2112 - 2135 | - HORNING; ROSENBERG, N. ENGL. J. MED., (1984), vol. 311, pages 1471 - 1475 | - U. KLEIN ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS IMMUNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 8, pages 22 - 23 | - R.E. DAVIS ET AL., JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2001), vol. 194, pages 1861 - 1874 | - G. LENTZ ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 319, pages 1676 - 1679 | - M. COMPAGNO ET AL., NATURE, (2009), vol. 459, pages 712 - 721 | - L. SRINIVASAN ET AL., CELL, (2009), vol. 139, pages 573 - 586 | - STAUDT ET AL., NATURE, (20100107), vol. 463, pages 88 - 92 | - DEY ET AL., "Revised European American Lymphoma", CYTOJOURNAL, (2006), vol. 3, no. 24 | - NISITANI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 2221 - 2226 | - IMPURITIES: GUIDELINES FOR RESIDUAL SOLVENTS, (200511), vol. Q3C, no. R3 | - LIBERMAN ET AL., Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, (1990), vol. 1, pages 209 - 214 | - SINGH ET AL., Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, (2002), pages 751 - 753 | other | WO2016141068 |