EP3566396 - METHODS, CONTROL NODE, NETWORK ELEMENT AND SYSTEM FOR HANDLING NETWORK EVENTS IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Vincent Smedjevägen 7 191 49 Sollentuna / SE | 02 /
VLACHOU-KONCHYLAKI, Martha Rutger Fucshgatan 9, Igh 1503 11667 Stockholm / SE | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 17700898.4 | 03.01.2017 | [2019/46] | WO2017EP50075 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018127273 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3566396 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
H04L41/145 (EP);
H04L41/0686 (US);
H04L41/0604 (EP);
H04L41/0631 (EP);
H04L41/069 (US);
H04L41/147 (EP,US);
H04L41/0654 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, STEUERKNOTEN, NETZWERKELEMENT UND SYSTEM ZUR HANDHABUNG VON NETZWERKEREIGNISSEN IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2019/46] | English: | METHODS, CONTROL NODE, NETWORK ELEMENT AND SYSTEM FOR HANDLING NETWORK EVENTS IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2019/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, NOEUD DE COMMANDE, ÉLÉMENT DE RÉSEAU ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'ÉVÉNEMENTS DE RÉSEAU DANS UN RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 26.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 20.02.2020 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/33] | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2014355454 (SERBAN CONSTANTIN [US], et al) [X] 21-28,30 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1-5; claims 1-8 *[I] 1-4,7,9-14,17,19,20,29,31; | [I]GB2523237 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB]) [I] 1-7,9-17,19-31 * page 1 - page 4 * * page 7 - page 12 * * page 14 - page 17 * * page 19 - page 24; figure 7; claims 1-6 *; | [I]US2015317197 (BLAIR LOUDON THOMAS [US]) [I] 1-31 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0044]; claims 1-15 * |