EP3407943 - CARTRIDGE ASSEMBLY HAVING AN ACTUATION PORTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAYGILI, Ali Murat Rue Erhard-Borel 5 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Dowling, Ian Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/49] | Application number, filing date | 17701162.4 | 25.01.2017 | [2018/49] | WO2017EP51545 | Priority number, date | EP20160152628 | 25.01.2016 Original published format: EP 16152628 | [2018/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017129615 | Date: | 03.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3407943 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3407943 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/00, A61M15/06 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
A61M15/06 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/42 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/10 (KR);
A24F40/30 (EP,US);
A24F40/485 (EP,US);
A61M11/00 (US);
A61M11/042 (EP,KR,RU);
A61M15/002 (KR,RU);
A61M15/0021 (KR);
A61M15/0065 (KR);
A24F40/20 (EP,US);
A24F40/46 (EP,US);
A24F40/465 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/3653 (KR);
A61M2205/368 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTUSCHENANORDNUNG MIT EINEM BETÄTIGUNGSABSCHNITT | [2018/49] | English: | CARTRIDGE ASSEMBLY HAVING AN ACTUATION PORTION | [2018/49] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE CARTOUCHE AYANT UNE PARTIE D'ACTIONNEMENT | [2019/45] |
Former [2018/49] | ENSEMBLE CARTOUCHE COMPORTANT UNE PARTIE D'ACTIONNEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 21.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2017 | AL | 08.04.2020 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.01.2017 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MK | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 25.01.2017 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2013083635 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]WO2014140320 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XI]WO2015000974 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1,4,6,7,10-14 * abstract * * page 27, line 16 - line 37 * * page 28; figures 3, 4; claims 1-14 * [I] 2,3,5,8,9,15; | [A]WO2015022317 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XI]WO2015197627 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * page 21, paragraph l * * page 22, paragraph first; figures 1-6 * [I] 2-9,11-15 | by applicant | WO2008121610 |