EP3433427 - IMPROVED FILTER PAPER FOR CIGARETTE FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states delfortgroup AG Fabrikstrasse 20 4050 Traun / AT | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMANN, Stefan Blutschwitzerweg 6 6166 Fulpmes / AT | 02 /
MAIR, Christian Fischerweg 5 6122 Fritzens / AT | 03 /
VOLGGER, Dietmar Gnadenwald 62C 6069 Gnadenwald / AT | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 17701315.8 | 24.01.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017EP51368 | Priority number, date | DE201610105235 | 21.03.2016 Original published format: DE102016105235 | [2019/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017162347 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3433427 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3433427 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/00, A24D1/02, A24D3/06, A24D3/10, D21H27/08, D21H11/00, D21H15/06 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
A24D3/10 (EP,US);
A24D3/06 (EP,US);
D21H11/00 (EP,US);
D21H15/06 (EP,US);
D21H27/00 (EP,US);
D21H27/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2019/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES FILTERPAPIER FÜR ZIGARETTENFILTER | [2019/05] | English: | IMPROVED FILTER PAPER FOR CIGARETTE FILTERS | [2019/05] | French: | PAPIER FILTRE AMÉLIORÉ POUR FILTRE DE CIGARETTE | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 24.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2021
09.06.2021
ADMISSIBLE Schweitzer-Mauduit International Inc. 100 North Point Center East, Suite 600 Alpharetta GA 30022 / US Opponent's representative Wall, Leythem Oxon IP B.V. Evert Van De Beekstraat 354 1118 CZ Schiphol / NL | 02
09.06.2021
Miquel y Costas & Miquel S.A. C/ Tuset 8-10 08008 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Cueto, Sénida SP3 Patents S.L. Los Madroños, 23 28891 Velilla de San Antonio / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2021
09.06.2021
ADMISSIBLE Schweitzer-Mauduit International Inc. 100 North Point Center East, Suite 600 Alpharetta GA 30022 / US Opponent's representative Wall, Leythem Oxon IP B.V. Evert Van DE Beekstraat 354 1118 CZ Schiphol / NL | ||
02
09.06.2021
Miquel y Costas & Miquel S.A. C/ Tuset 8-10 08008 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Cueto, Sénida SP3 Patents S.L. Los Madroños, 23 28891 Velilla de San Antonio / ES | 23.06.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.11.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 30.03.2023 | Appeal received No. T0664/23 | 30.03.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 19.06.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.04.2023 | Appeal received No. T0664/23 | 05.04.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 04.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2017 | AL | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | IE | 24.01.2021 | LU | 24.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.01.2017 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 24.01.2017 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1098036 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [A] 1-26* claims 1-15 *; | [ID]EP2761085 (DELFORTGROUP AG [AT]) [ID] 1-26 * claims 1-15 *; | [A] - Bioresources Com ET AL, "PEER-REVIEWED ARTICLE COMPARISON OF THE PROPERTIES OF WOOD AND PULP FIBERS FROM LODGEPOLE PINE (Pinus contorta) AND SCOTS PINE (Pinus sylvestris)", BioResources, (20120101), pages 1771 - 1783, URL: https://www.ncsu.edu/bioresources/BioRes_07/BioRes_07_2_1802_Sable_GJVIVT_Wood_Fibers_Lodgepole_Scots_Pines_2362.pdf, XP055356045 [A] 1-26 * table 4 * | by applicant | EP2761085 | Opposition | EP0758532 | JP2003119613 | US2014137880 | WO2015035137 | US2015173414 | WO2015178995 | GB2075328 | US4809717 | US5394895 | US5692527 | US6103294 | WO2009031246 | US2012067359 | US2013014774 | WO2014207704 | US2015374030 | - ANDRITZ, "Papillon refiner. Gentle fiber treatment with low energy consumption", ANDRITZ - Brochure, (20100000), URL: https://www.andritz.com/resource/blob/22642/a05d97de8d3547b0820756e5430080fb/pp-stockpreparation-lowconsistency-refining-papillon-data.pdf, XP055815760 | - Sven-Olof LUNDQVIST et al, "Models for fibre dimensions in different softwood species. Simulation and comparison of within and between tree variations for Norway and Sitka spruce, Scots and Loblolly pine", IUFRO FIFTH WORKSHOPE Wood Quality Modelling, Auckland, New Zealand, (20051122), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://www.trees4future.eu/uploads/TAs/IUFRO%20paper%20NZ%202005_Comparison%20of%20wood%20species_f_ART%2005_54.pdf, XP055815757 | - Martin Hubbe, "SOFTWOOD", Mini-Encyclopedia of Papermaking Wet-End Chemistry. Additives and Ingredients, their Composition, Functions, Strategies for Use and Common Wet-End Chemical Terms, URL: https://projects.ncsu.edu/project/hubbepaperchem/SW.htm | - ANDRITZ, "The most advanced refining system for any application ANDRITZ low-consistency refining", ANDRITZ, (2021), URL: https://www.andritz.com/products-en/pulp-and-paper/pulp-and-paper/paper-production/stock-preparation/low-consistency-refining, XP055815761 | - Andritz, "TwinFlo Refiner. Balanced Refining", Andritz, (200910), URL: https://www.andritz.com/resource/blob/22644/1be0b0bcde0279fecb0e2ee5575524ce/pp-stockpreparation-lowconsistency-refining-twinflo-data.pdf, XP055815762 | - Luciana, "Cationic Starch", Mini-Encyclopedia of Papermaking Wet-End Chemistry, (20080416), URL: https://cationicstarch.blogspot.com/2008/04/mini-encyclopedia-of-papermaking-wet.html, XP055815759 | - BIORESOURCES COM et al., "PEER-REVIEWED ARTICLE COMPARISON OF THE PROPERTIES OF WOOD AND PULP FIBERS FROM LODGEPOLE PINE (Pinus contorta) AND SCOTS PINE (Pinus sylvestris", BioResources, (20120101), pages 1771 - 1783, XP055356045 | - "Papillon Refiner - Gentle and Stable Refining", ANDRITZ PULP, (20100101), XP055815760 |