EP3411004 - PROCESS OF MANUFACTURING A STABLE, READY TO USE INFUSION BAG FOR AN OXIDATION SENSITIVE FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InnoPharma, Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2021/10] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states InnoPharma, Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINGORANI, Tushar 84 Royal Drive Apartment No. 321 Piscataway, New Jersey 08854 / US | 02 /
KUNADHARAJU, Sasank Chaitanya 32 Stony Road Edison, New Jersey 08817 / US | 03 /
MALKAN, Tushar 32 DARBY CT INDIAN CREEK IL 60061-3271 / US | 04 /
PEJAVER, Satish 563 Glen Ridge Drive South Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2018/50] | Application number, filing date | 17702164.9 | 23.01.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017IB50341 | Priority number, date | US201662291589P | 05.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662291589 P | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017134540 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3411004 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3411004 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/10, A61K9/08, A61L2/07, A61K31/167 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/167 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L2/0023 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61J1/10 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61J3/002 (IL,KR);
A61K47/02 (IL,US);
A61K47/06 (IL,KR);
A61K47/12 (IL,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L2/07 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61P25/04 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES STABILEN, GEBRAUCHSFERTIGEN INFUSIONSBEUTELS FÜR EINE OXIDATIONSEMPFINDLICHE FORMULIERUNG | [2018/50] | English: | PROCESS OF MANUFACTURING A STABLE, READY TO USE INFUSION BAG FOR AN OXIDATION SENSITIVE FORMULATION | [2018/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE POCHE POUR PERFUSION INTRAVEINEUSE STABLE ET PRÊTE À L'EMPLOI POUR UNE FORMULATION SENSIBLE À L'OXYDATION | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 05.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MK | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | RS | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | HR | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | HR | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | HR | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | HR | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | LT | 10.03.2021 | |
NO | 10.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US6028222 (DIETLIN FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [XD] 1-20 * column 5, lines 24-35 * * column 9; table 4.1 *; | [X]EP1889607 (GENFARMA LAB S L [ES]) [X] 1-20 * page 3, lines 15-18 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0026] , [0027]; example -; table 2 *; | [X]EP2377516 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0015] , [0020] , [0041] , [0046] - [0049] - [0069] - [0077]; table - *; | [X]WO2014083071 (GENFARMA LAB S L [ES]) [X] 1-20 * page 4, lines 20-29 * * page 7, paragraph l; example - * * pages 15-16 *; | [A]WO2014168895 (INNOPHARMA LICENSING LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0025] , [0042] , [0054]; example - *; | [X]WO2016013049 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0016]; examples 2-4; tables 2-4 * | by applicant | US6028222 | US2004054012 | US2014303254 |