EP3405495 - NEUTRALIZATION OF INHIBITORY PATHWAYS IN LYMPHOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innate Pharma 117, Avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | [2021/08] |
Former [2018/48] | For all designated states Innate Pharma 117, Avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRE, Pascale 38 rue de la Loubière 13006 Marseille / FR | 02 /
BLERY, Mathieu 50 Bd du Vaisseau Les Hauts de Mazargues Bt D4 13009 Marseille / FR | 03 /
DENIS, Caroline 10 Rue André Audoli 13010 Marseille / FR | 04 /
PATUREL, Carine 411 allée du bois 69280 Marcy l'Etoile / FR | 05 /
WAGTMANN, Nicolai 16 Avenue Joseph Liautaud 13260 Cassis / FR | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Gallois, Valérie Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2018/48] | Völlmy, Lukas Innate Pharma IP Department 117, avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 17702315.7 | 20.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017EP51153 | Priority number, date | US201662281217P | 21.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662281217 P | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017125532 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3405495 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3405495 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K39/39558 (IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61P35/04 (CN);
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (IL,KR);
C07K2317/52 (IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/48] | C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Extension states | BA | 20.07.2018 | ME | 20.07.2018 | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUTRALISIERUNG VON INHIBITORISCHEN PFADEN IN LYMPHOZYTEN | [2018/48] | English: | NEUTRALIZATION OF INHIBITORY PATHWAYS IN LYMPHOCYTES | [2018/48] | French: | NEUTRALISATION DES VOIES D'INHIBITION DES LYMPHOCYTES | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 20.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21158066.7 / EP3868787 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.11.2021
26.11.2021
ADMISSIBLE Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK Opponent's representative Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2023/22] |
Former [2021/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.11.2021
Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK Opponent's representative Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 08.12.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.04.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.02.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.02.2023 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 25.04.2023 | Appeal received No. T0781/23 | 25.04.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 03.07.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/42] | IS | 24.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008009545 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [XP]WO2016041945 (INNATE PHARMA [FR]); | by applicant | US5229275 | US5567610 | WO9928748 | WO03101485 | WO2006121168 | WO2007005874 | WO2008156712 | WO2009014708 | WO2009101611 | WO2009114335 | WO2010077634 | WO2011066389 | US8206709 | WO2012145493 | US2013034559 | WO2013019906 | WO2015085847 | Opposition | WO2008009545 |