EP3414475 - IMPROVED SEALING DEVICE, NOTABLY WITH REGARD TO CONTAMINATION BY EXTERNAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUTAUD, Charlie 8 rue du Coneu 52360 Orbigny Au Mont / FR | 02 /
FORTE, Olivier 8 chemin de l'Argillier 10200 Bar Sur Aube / FR | 03 /
LUTAUD, Dominique 6 rue des Fermiers 52160 Auberive / FR | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [2020/15] |
Former [2018/51] | Cabinet Nuss 10 rue Jacques Kable 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17703178.8 | 09.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017EP52818 | Priority number, date | FR20160051017 | 09.02.2016 Original published format: FR 1651017 | [2018/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017137475 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414475 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3414475 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/16, F16J15/3228, F16J15/3264 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
F16J15/3228 (EP,KR,US);
F16J15/16 (RU);
F16J15/164 (EP,KR,US);
F16J15/3264 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE DICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE IM HINBLICK AUF EINE KONTAMINATION DURCH EXTERNE AGENTEN | [2018/51] | English: | IMPROVED SEALING DEVICE, NOTABLY WITH REGARD TO CONTAMINATION BY EXTERNAL AGENTS | [2018/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ETANCHEITE AMELIORE, NOTAMMENT EN REGARD D'UNE CONTAMINATION PAR DES AGENTS EXTERIEURS | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 04.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.04.2020 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10259400 (FAG KUGELFISCHER AG [DE]); | [A]FR2927395 (RENAULT SAS [FR]); | [Y]US2013200575 (HUMBLOT LUC [FR], et al); | [A]EP2913566 (NOK CORP [JP]); | [Y]DE102015210017 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) | by applicant | GB2123498 | EP2044351 | CN202469005U | FR2986598 | EP2739885 | EP2895773 |