12.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.08.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.04.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.08.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.05.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.03.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
02.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.12.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.07.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.07.2019 |
First examination report |
|
10.04.2019 |
Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.03.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
22.03.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
14.03.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] |
26.10.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
26.10.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] |
02.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
30.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|