EP3405906 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RECOGNIZING MULTIPLE OBJECT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MyScript 3, rue de la Rainière Parc Club du Perray 44339 Nantes Cedex 3 / FR | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONIS, Sebastien c/o MyScript 3 Rue de la Rainière Parc Club du Perray 44339 Nantes Cedex 3 / FR | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 17703316.4 | 20.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017EP00074 | Priority number, date | EP20160290015 | 20.01.2016 Original published format: EP 16290015 | US201615152762 | 12.05.2016 Original published format: US201615152762 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017125248 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3405906 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
G06V30/36 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0487 (US);
G06F3/04883 (KR);
G06F40/171 (US);
G06V30/22 (KR);
G06V30/268 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER MEHRFACHOBJEKTSTRUKTUR | [2018/48] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RECOGNIZING MULTIPLE OBJECT STRUCTURE | [2018/48] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE DE STRUCTURE D'OBJETS MULTIPLES | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 05.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - KENICHI TOYOZUMI ET AL, "An on-line handwritten mathematical equation recognition system that can process matrix expressions by referring to the relative positions of matrix elements", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN., US, (20060101), vol. 37, no. 14, doi:10.1002/scj.10684, ISSN 0882-1666, pages 87 - 96, XP055361730 [X] 1-18 * Section 3.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/scj.10684 | [X] - CHUANJUN LI ET AL, "Online recognition of handwritten mathematical expressions with support for matrices", 19TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2008: ICPR 2008; 8 - 11 DEC. 2008, TAMPA, FLORIDA, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20081208), ISBN 978-1-4244-2174-9, pages 1 - 4, XP031412418 [X] 1-18 * Section 3 * * Section 3.2 * * Section 3.3 * | [X] - Mohamed A Alkalai, "Table recognition in mathematical documents", PhD Thesis, (20150101), pages 1 - 203, URL: http://etheses.bham.ac.uk/6333/1/Alkalai15PhD.pdf, (20170404), XP055361674 [X] 1-18 * Section 2.12.4 * * Section 4 * * Section 5 * | by applicant | US7447360 | US8121412 |