EP3537863 - METHOD FOR PREDICTIVELY GENERATING DATA FOR CONTROLLING A TRAVEL PATH AND AN OPERATING SEQUENCE FOR AGRICULTURAL VEHICLES AND MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LACOS GmbH Industriesstrasse 9 07937 Zeulenroda-Triebes / DE | [2024/04] |
Former [2019/38] | For all designated states Lacos Computerservice GmbH Industriestrasse 9 07937 Zeulenroda-Triebes / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMME, Thomas Ortsstrasse 4 07907 Göschitz / DE | 02 /
DAMME, Bernd Unteres Dorf 16 07937 Langenwolschendorf / DE | [2019/38] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Berliner Straße 1 07545 Gera / DE | [2024/14] |
Former [2019/38] | Kruspig, Volkmar, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Berliner Straße 1 07545 Gera / DE | Application number, filing date | 17703756.1 | 08.02.2017 | [2019/38] | WO2017EP52715 | Priority number, date | DE201610121523 | 10.11.2016 Original published format: DE102016121523 | [2019/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018086764 | Date: | 17.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3537863 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3537863 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01B69/04, A01B79/00 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
A01B69/008 (EP);
A01B79/005 (EP);
B60W30/0956 (EP);
B60W50/0097 (EP);
B60W2300/152 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM PRÄDIKTIVEN ERZEUGEN VON DATEN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES FAHRWEGES UND EINES BETRIEBSABLAUFES FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE FAHRZEUGE UND MASCHINEN | [2023/34] | English: | METHOD FOR PREDICTIVELY GENERATING DATA FOR CONTROLLING A TRAVEL PATH AND AN OPERATING SEQUENCE FOR AGRICULTURAL VEHICLES AND MACHINES | [2019/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE DONNÉES DE MANIÈRE PRÉDICTIVE DESTINÉ À LA COMMANDE D'UNE VOIE ET D'UNE SÉQUENCE DE FONCTIONNEMENT POUR VÉHICULES ET MACHINES AGRICOLES | [2019/38] |
Former [2019/38] | VERFAHREN ZUM PRÄDIKATIVEN ERZEUGEN VON DATEN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES FAHRWEGES UND EINES BETRIEBSABLAUFES FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE FAHRZEUGE UND MASCHINEN | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2019/38] | 24.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2011022267 (MURPHY MICHAEL D [US]) [I] 1,10-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0035] - [0073]; figures 1-18 * [A] 2-9; | [A]US2011054729 (WHITEHEAD MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0149] *; | [A]WO2012007549 (CNH BELGIUM NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 8, line 10 - page 24, paragraph 13; figures 1-19 *; | [A]DE102012017118 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0047] - [0051]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2980668 (TOKYO KEIKI INC [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0021] - [0084]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2016100088 (AGCO CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0041]; figures 1-9 * | Examination | EP2980668 | by applicant | EP0970505 | EP0887660 | DE102011078292 | EP1527667 |