EP3400068 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING MALIGNANT, AUTOIMMUNE AND INFLAMMATORY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yeda Research and Development Co., Ltd. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHACHAR, Idit 156 Aluf David Street 5222208 Ramat-Gan / IL | 02 /
LEWINSKY, Hadas c/o Yeda Research and Development CO. LTD. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
RADOMIR, Lihi c/o Yeda Research and Development CO. LTD. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | 04 /
WIENER, Anna c/o Yeda Research and Development CO. LTD. at the Weizmann Institute of Science P.O. Box 95 7610002 Rehovot / IL | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2018/46] | Application number, filing date | 17704549.9 | 05.01.2017 | [2018/46] | WO2017IL50019 | Priority number, date | US201662275378P | 06.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662275378 P | [2018/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017118985 | Date: | 13.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3400068 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61K39/395, A61K31/7088, C12N15/113, C07K16/28 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP,US);
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BÖSARTIGEN, AUTOIMMUN- UND ENTZÜNDUNGSERKRANKUNGEN | [2018/46] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING MALIGNANT, AUTOIMMUNE AND INFLAMMATORY DISEASES | [2018/46] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'AFFECTIONS MALIGNES, AUTOIMMUNES ET INFLAMMATOIRES | [2018/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 26.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2010035259 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [AD] 4-6,11-19,22-26,38-40; | [AD]WO2015118538 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]) [AD] 4-6,11-19,22-26,38-40; | [AD] - I BINSKY-EHRENREICH ET AL, "CD84 is a survival receptor for CLL cells", ONCOGENE, (20130225), vol. 33, no. 8, doi:10.1038/onc.2013.31, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 1006 - 1016, XP055358089 [AD] 4-6,11-19,22-26,38-40 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2013.31 | [I] - SHU DING ET AL, "Decreased microRNA-142-3p/5p expression causes CD4+ T cell activation and B cell hyperstimulation in systemic lupus erythematosus", ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (20120901), vol. 64, no. 9, doi:10.1002/art.34505, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 2953 - 2963, XP055137316 [I] 4,5,11-16,38-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.34505 | [A] - OLIVER-VILA ET AL, "The leukocyte receptor CD84 inhibits FcEpsilonRI-mediated signaling through homophilic interaction in transfected RBL-2H3 cells", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, (20080219), vol. 45, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.MOLIMM.2007.12.006, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 2138 - 2149, XP022513093 [A] 4-6,11-19,22-26,38-40 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2007.12.006 | by applicant | US3791932 | US3839153 | US3850752 | US3850578 | US3853987 | US3867517 | US3879262 | US3901654 | US3935074 | US3984533 | US3996345 | US4034074 | US4036945 | US4098876 | US4331647 | US4666828 | US4683202 | US4801531 | US4816567 | US4879219 | EP0375408 | US4946778 | US5011771 | US5192659 | US5272057 | US5281521 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5661016 | US5721138 | US6326174 | US6348185 | US2002123476 | US2002128218 | US2003017068 | US2003096980 | US2003232410 | US6774279 | US2005027114 | US2005025789 | US2005026157 | US2006014264 | WO2009071334 | WO2010035259 | US8021867 | WO2011146121 | US8119381 | US8124369 | US8129134 | US8133697 | US8143015 | US8143016 | US8148098 | US8163514 | US8304222 | US8586526 | WO2014085593 | US8771945 | WO2015118538 | - BINSKY-EHRENREICH I. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2014), vol. 33, pages 1006 - 1016 | - BINSKY-EHRENREICH, I. ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2014), vol. 33, no. 8, pages 1006 - 1016 | - YURCHENKO M. ET AL., EXP ONCOL, (2011), vol. 33, no. 1, pages 9 - 18 | - SCHWEIGHOFER C. D. ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 12, page E28277 | - GRZYWNOWICZ, M. ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 4, page E35178 | - MCCLANAHAN, F. ET AL., BLOOD, (2015), vol. 126, no. 2, pages 203 - 211 | - WOO S.R. ET AL., CANCER RES, (2012), vol. 72, no. 4, pages 917 - 927 | - ITO A. ET AL., BIOMED RES INT, (2015), page 605478 | - PARDOLL, NATURE REVIEWS CANCER, (2012), vol. 12, pages 252 - 264 | - PORTER, R. R, BIOCHEM. J., (1959), vol. 73, pages 119 - 126 | - INBAR ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1972), vol. 69, pages 2659 - 62 | - WHITLOW; FILPULA, METHODS, (1991), vol. 2, pages 97 - 105 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - PACK ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, pages 1271 - 77 | - LARRICK; FRY, METHODS, (1991), vol. 2, pages 106 - 10 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329 | - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, page 581 | - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, (1985), page 77 | - BOERNER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, no. L, pages 86 - 95 | - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - LONBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 856 - 859 | - MORRISON, NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 812 - 13 | - FISHWILD ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 845 - 51 | - NEUBERGER, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, page 826 | - LONBERG; HUSZAR, INTERN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - STRAT ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 34, no. 13, pages 3803 - 3810 | - BHARGAVA A ET AL., BRAIN RES. PROTOC., (2004), vol. 13, pages 115 - 125 | - DIALLO M. ET AL., OLIGONUCLEOTIDES, (2003), vol. 13, pages 381 - 392 | - PADDISON P.J. ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI. USA., (2002), vol. 99, pages 1443 - 1448 | - TRAN N. ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2004), vol. 573, pages 127 - 134 | - BILLY ET AL., PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, pages 14428 - 14433 | - DIALLO ET AL., OLIGONUCLEOTIDES, (20031001), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 381 - 392 | - SHINAGWA; ISHII, GENES & DEV., (2003), vol. 17, no. 11, pages 1340 - 1345 | - BRUMMELKAMP, T. R. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, page 550 | - CASTANOTTO, D. ET AL., RNA, (2002), vol. 8, page 1454 | - TUSCHLCHEMBIOCHEM, vol. 2, pages 239 - 245 | - BARTEL, CELL, (2004), vol. 116, page 281 | - DOENCH; SHARP, GENESDEV, (2004), vol. 2004, page 504 | - BRENNECKE ET AL., PLOS, (2005), vol. 3, page E85 | - LEWIS, CELL, (2005), vol. 120, page 15 | - KREK ET AL., NAT GENET, (2005), vol. 37, page 495 | - BREAKER, R.R.; JOYCE, G., CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 2, page 655 | - SANTORO, S.W.; JOYCE, G.F., PROC. NATL, ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 943, page 4262 | - SANTORO, S.W.; JOYCE, G.F., PROC. NATL, ACAD. SCI. USA, page 199 | - KHACHIGIAN, LM, CURROPINMOLTHER, (2002), vol. 4, pages 119 - 21 | - ITOH ET AL., ANN MEETING AM. SOC. GEN. THER., (2002), vol. 409 | - LUFT, J MOL MED, (1998), vol. 76, pages 75 - 6 | - KRONENWETT ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 91, pages 852 - 62 | - RAJUR ET AL., BIOCONJUGCHEM, (1997), vol. 8, pages 935 - 40 | - LAVIGNE ET AL., BIOCHEMBIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1997), vol. 237, pages 566 - 71 | - AOKI ET AL., BIOCHEMBIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1997), vol. 231, pages 540 - 5 | - WALTON ET AL., BIOTECHNOLBIOENG, (1999), vol. 65, pages 1 - 9 | - MATVEEVA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 1374 - 1375 | - HOLMUND ET AL., CURROPINMOLTHER, (1999), vol. 1, pages 372 - 85 | - GERWITZ, CURROPINMOLTHER, (1999), vol. 1, pages 297 - 306 | - UNO ET AL., CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 7855 - 60 | - WELCH ET AL., CURROPINBIOTECHNOL., (1998), vol. 9, pages 486 - 96 | - WELCH ET AL., CLINDIAGNVIROL., (1998), vol. 10, pages 163 - 71 | - MAHER III, L. J. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 245, pages 725 - 730 | - MOSER, H. E. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 238, pages 645 - 630 | - BEAL, P. A. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 251, pages 1360 - 1363 | - COONEY, M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 456 - 459 | - SEIDMAN; GLAZER, J CLIN INVEST, (2003), vol. 112, pages 487 - 94 | - VASQUEZ ET AL., NUCL ACIDS RES., (1999), vol. 27, pages 1176 - 81 | - PURI ET AL., J BIOLCHEM, (2001), vol. 276, pages 28991 - 98 | - CARBONE ET AL., NUCL ACID RES., (2003), vol. 31, pages 833 - 43 | - BESCH ET AL., JBIOLCHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 32473 - 79 | - VUYISICH; BEAL, NUC. ACIDS RES, (2000), vol. 28, pages 2369 - 74 | - MENKE D, GENESIS, (2013), vol. 51, page 618 | - CAPECCHI, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1288 - 1292 | - SANTIAGO ET AL., PROC NATL ACADSCI USA, (2008), vol. 105, pages 5809 - 5814 | - CERTO, MT ET AL., NATURE METHODS, (2012), vol. 9, pages 073 - 975 | - REYON ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (201205), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 460 - 5 | - MILLER ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2011), vol. 29, pages 143 - 148 | - CERMAK ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2011), vol. 39, no. 12, page E82 | - ZHANG ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 149 - 53 | - JINEK ET AL., SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821 | - IZSVAK; IVICS, MOLECULAR THERAPY, (2004), vol. 9, pages 147 - 156 | - WILSON ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY, (2007), vol. 15, pages 139 - 145 | - KAWAKAMI ET AL., PNAS, (2000), vol. 97, no. 21, pages 11403 - 11408 | - MISKEY ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (20031201), vol. 31, no. 23, pages 6873 - 6881 | - CHIORAZZI N; RAI KR; FERRARINI M, "Chronic lymphocytic leukemia", N. ENGL. J. MED., (2005), vol. 352, no. 8, pages 804 - 15 | - KRENN V ET AL., HISTOL HISTOPATHOL, (200007), vol. 15, no. 3, page 791 | - JAN VOSWINKEL ET AL., ARTHRITIS RES, (2001), vol. 3, no. 3, page 189 | - ERIKSON J. ET AL., IMMUNOL RES, (1998), vol. 17, no. 1-2, page 49 | - RENAUDINEAU Y ET AL., CLIN DIAGN LAB IMMUNOL., (199903), vol. 6, no. 2, page 156 | - CHAN OT. ET AL., IMMUNOL REV, (199906), vol. 169, page 107 | - ZIMMET P., DIABETES RES CLIN PRACT, (199610), vol. 34, page S125 | - ORGIAZZI J., ENDOCRINOL METAB CLIN NORTH AM, (200006), vol. 29, no. 2, page 339 | - BRALEY-MULLEN H.; YU S, J IMMUNOL, (20001215), vol. 165, no. 12, page 7262 | - TOYODA N. ET AL., NIPPON RINSHO, (199908), vol. 57, no. 8, page 1810 | - MITSUMA T, NIPPON RINSHO, (199908), vol. 57, no. 8, page 1759 | - GARZA KM. ET AL., J REPROD IMMUNOL, (199802), vol. 37, no. 2, page 87 | - DIEKMAN AB. ET AL., AM J REPROD IMMUNOL., (200003), vol. 43, no. 3, page 134 | - TINCANI A. ET AL., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 107 - 9 | - CROSS AH. ET AL., J NEUROIMMUNOL, (20010101), vol. 112, no. 1-2, page 1 | - ORON L ET AL., J NEURAL TRANSM, (1997), vol. 49, page 77 | - INFANTE AJ; KRAIG E, INT REV IMMUNOL, (1999), vol. 18, no. 1-2, page 83 | - KORNBERG AJ, J CLIN NEUROSCI., (200005), vol. 7, no. 3, page 191 | - KUSUNOKI S, AM J MED SCI., (200004), vol. 319, no. 4, page 234 | - TAKAMORI M., AM J MED SCI, (200004), vol. 319, no. 4, page 204 | - ANTOINE JC.; HONNORAT J., REV NEUROL (PARIS, (200001), vol. 156, no. 1, page 23 | - NOBILE-ORAZIO E. ET AL., ELECTROENCEPHALOGR CLIN NEUROPHYSIOL SUPPL, (1999), vol. 50, page 419 | - VINCENT A ET AL., ANN N Y ACAD SCI., (19980513), vol. 841, page 482 | - MATSUURA E ET AL., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, page S135 | - VAARALA O, LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 2, page S132 | - PRAPROTNIK S. ET AL., WIEN KLIN WOCHENSCHR, (20000825), vol. 112, no. 15-16, page 660 | - LACROIX-DESMAZES S. ET AL., SEMIN THROMB HEMOST., (2000), vol. 26, no. 2, page 157 | - NOEL LH., ANN MED INTERNE (PARIS, (200005), vol. 151, no. 3, page 178 | - FLAMHOLZ R. ET AL., J CLIN APHERESIS, (1999), vol. 14, no. 4, page 171 | - WALLUKAT G. ET AL., AM J CARDIOL., (19990617), vol. 83, no. 12A, page 75H | - MOCCIA F, ANN ITAL MED INT., (199904), vol. 14, no. 2, page 114 | - EFREMOV DG. ET AL., LEUK LYMPHOMA, (199801), vol. 28, no. 3-4, page 285 | - GARCIA HEROLA A ET AL., GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL., (200001), vol. 23, no. 1, page 16 | - LANDAU YE.; SHOENFELD Y., HAREFUAH, (20000116), vol. 138, no. 2, page 122 | - FEIST E ET AL., INT ARCH ALLERGY IMMUNOL, (200009), vol. 123, no. 1, page 92 | - ZAULI D. ET AL., BIOMED PHARMACOTHER, (199906), vol. 53, no. 5-6, page 234 | - MANNS MP, J HEPATOL, (200008), vol. 33, no. 2, page 326 | - STRASSBURG CP ET AL., EUR J GASTROENTEROL HEPATOL., (199906), vol. LL, no. 6, page 595 | - TISCH R; MCDEVITT HO., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (19940118), vol. 91, no. 2, page 437 | - DATTA SK., LUPUS, (1998), vol. 7, no. 9, page 591 | - CASTANO L.; EISENBARTH GS, ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., vol. 8, page 647 | - SAKATA S. ET AL., MOL CELL ENDOCRINOL, (199303), vol. 92, no. 1, page 77 | - ALEXANDER RB ET AL., UROLOGY, (199712), vol. 50 | - HARA T. ET AL., BLOOD, (19910301), vol. 77, no. 5, page 1127 | - SODERSTROM M. ET AL., J NEUROL NEUROSURG PSYCHIATRY, (199405), vol. 57, no. 5, page 544 | - OSHIMA M. ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (199012), vol. 20, no. 12, page 2563 | - HIEMSTRA HS ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (20010327), vol. 98, no. 7, page 3988 | - CUNHA-NETO E. ET AL., J CLIN INVEST, (19961015), vol. 98, no. 8, page 1709 | - SEMPLE JW. ET AL., BLOOD, (19960515), vol. 87, no. 10, page 4245 | - CAPOROSSI AP ET AL., VIRAL IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 11, no. 1, page 9 | - SALLAH S ET AL., ANN HEMATOL, (199703), vol. 74, no. 3, page 139 | - FRANCO A; 1990 MAR ET AL., CLIN IMMUNOL IMMUNOPATHOL, vol. 54, no. 3, page 382 | - JONES DE, CLIN SCI (COLCH, (199611), vol. 91, no. 5, page 551 | - KELLY CJ, J AM SOC NEPHROL, (199008), vol. L, no. 2, page 140 | - YOO TJ. ET AL., CELL IMMUNOL, (199408), vol. 157, no. 1, page 249 | - GLODDEK B ET AL., ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (19971229), vol. 830, page 266 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO. | - MCGARY ET AL., "Animal models for viral infection and cell exhaustion", CURR OPIN HIV AIDS, (2014), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 492 - 499 | - BICHI R ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, no. 10, pages 6955 - 6960 | - SHIMONI A; MARCUS H; CANAAN A ET AL., "A model for human B-chronic lymphocytic leukemia in human/mouse radiation chimera: evidence for tumor-mediated suppression of antibody production in low-stage disease", BLOOD, (1997), vol. 89, pages 2210 - 2218 | - "chapter1", FINGL ET AL., The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (1975), page 1 | - AUSUBEL, R. M., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, (1994), vol. I-III | - WATSON ET AL., Recombinant DNA, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN BOOKS | - BIRREN ET AL., Genome Analysis: A Laboratory Manual Series, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1998), vol. 1-4 | - CELLIS, J. E., Cell Biology: A Laboratory Handbook, (1994), vol. I-III | - COLIGAN J. E., Current Protocols in Immunology, (1994), vol. I-III | - Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 1-317 | - KURTOVA, A. V. ET AL., BLOOD, (2009), vol. 114, no. 20, pages 4441 - 4450 | - BINSKY, I ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2007), vol. 104, no. 33, pages 13408 - 13413 | - BINSKY, I. ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2010), vol. 184, no. 9, pages 4761 - 4769 | - BICHI R. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, no. 10, pages 6955 - 6960 | - CANNONS J. L. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2010), vol. 32, pages 253 - 65 | - CANNONS J. L. ET AL., ANNU REV IMMUNOL, (2011), vol. 29, pages 665 - 705 | - HOFBAUER J. P. ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (2011), vol. 25, no. 9, pages 1452 - 1458 | - NORDE, W. J ET AL., CANCER RES, (2011), vol. 71, no. 15, pages 5111 - 5122 | - BAITSCH, L ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 2, page E30852 | - DURAISWAMY, J. ET AL., CANCER RES, (2013), vol. 73, no. 12, pages 3591 - 3603 |