EP3413794 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING THE LOCATION AND ORIENTATION OF IMPLANTED DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verily Life Sciences LLC 269 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, You c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC 269 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Jiang c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC 269 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
KORHUMMEL, Sean c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC 269 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
O'DRISCOLL, Stephen c/o Verily Life Sciences LLC 269 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/29] |
Former [2018/51] | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17704641.4 | 31.01.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017US15833 | Priority number, date | US201615019641 | 09.02.2016 Original published format: US201615019641 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017139136 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413794 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3413794 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
H04W4/025 (EP,US);
A61B5/061 (US);
A61B5/062 (EP,US);
H04B1/385 (US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0219 (EP,US);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION UND AUSRICHTUNG VON IMPLANTIERTEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2018/51] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING THE LOCATION AND ORIENTATION OF IMPLANTED DEVICES | [2018/51] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER L'EMPLACEMENT ET L'ORIENTATION DE DISPOSITIFS IMPLANTÉS | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 31.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002107445 (GOVARI ASSAF [IL]); | [I]EP1374792 (BIOSENSE INC [US]); | [A]EP1790279 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]); | [X]EP2191768 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2012104733 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL], et al) |