EP3408282 - INCREASED TRIACYLGLYCEROL PRODUCTION IN MICROALGAE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalEnergies OneTech La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/28] |
Former [2021/48] | For all designated states Total Raffinage Chimie 2 Place Jean Millier La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2018/49] | For all designated states Total Raffinage Chimie 2 Place Jean Millier La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARECHAL, Eric 83 rue Nicolas Chorier 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
DOLCH, Lina Kaerntner Weg 42c 40591 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Blaise, Lucie, et al Total Recherche & Technologie Feluy Patent Department Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [2021/48] |
Former [2018/49] | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 17704682.8 | 27.01.2017 | [2018/49] | WO2017EP51823 | Priority number, date | WO2016EP153390 | 29.01.2016 Original published format: PCT/EP2016/153390 | [2018/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017129777 | Date: | 03.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3408282 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3408282 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/415, C12N15/82, C07K14/405, C12N9/02 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
C12N9/0075 (EP);
C07K14/405 (EP);
C12P7/6463 (EP);
C12Y114/13039 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERHÖHTE TRIACYLGLYCEROLHERSTELLUNG IN MIKROALGEN | [2018/49] | English: | INCREASED TRIACYLGLYCEROL PRODUCTION IN MICROALGAE | [2018/49] | French: | PRODUCTION DE TRIACYLGLYCÉROL ACCRUE DANS DES MICRO-ALGUES | [2021/21] |
Former [2018/49] | AUGMENTATION DE LA PRODUCTION DE TRIACYLGLYCÉROLS DANS DES MICROALGUES | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 24.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2017 | AL | 01.12.2021 | AT | 01.12.2021 | CY | 01.12.2021 | CZ | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | EE | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | HR | 01.12.2021 | LT | 01.12.2021 | LV | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | MK | 01.12.2021 | MT | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | PL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | RS | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SK | 01.12.2021 | SM | 01.12.2021 | IE | 27.01.2022 | IT | 27.01.2022 | LU | 27.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | BG | 01.03.2022 | GB | 01.03.2022 | NO | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | DE | 02.08.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.01.2017 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
MK | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 27.01.2022 | ||
IT | 27.01.2022 | ||
LU | 27.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GB | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
DE | 02.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 27.01.2017 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 27.01.2022 | ||
IT | 27.01.2022 | ||
LU | 27.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GB | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
DE | 02.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.01.2017 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 27.01.2022 | ||
IT | 27.01.2022 | ||
LU | 27.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GB | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
DE | 02.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 27.01.2022 | ||
IT | 27.01.2022 | ||
LU | 27.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GB | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
DE | 02.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 27.01.2022 | ||
LU | 27.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GB | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
DE | 02.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 27.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
DE | 02.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 27.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
DE | 02.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 27.01.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
DE | 02.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 27.01.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
DE | 02.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 27.01.2022 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2009125401 (ROSETTA GENOMICS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-4,11 * claims 1-3,11 * * page 10, lines 11-21 * * page 2, lines 10-11 *; | [X]WO2013126076 (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11 * claims 1-3 *; | [XY]WO2015008160 (CALLEJA PIERRE [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,10,12,15,19 * claims 1-3 * * page 3, lines 25-30 * [Y] 13,14,18; | [XY] - VARDI ASSAF ET AL, "A Diatom Gene Regulating Nitric-Oxide Signaling and Susceptibility to Diatom-Derived Aldehydes", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (200806), vol. 18, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.CUB.2008.05.037, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 895 - 899, XP028813755 [X] 1,3-6,11,12,15-17,19,20 * abstract * * page 897, column 2, lines 24-25 * * page 898, column 2, lines 34-37 * * page 898, column 2, lines 1-3 * [Y] 7-9,13,14,18,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cub.2008.05.037 | [Y] - VALERIA DI DATO ET AL, "Transcriptome sequencing of three Pseudo-nitzschia species reveals comparable gene sets and the presence of Nitric Oxide Synthase genes in diatoms", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20150720), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/srep12329, page 12329, XP055264077 [Y] 7-9,21 * abstract * * page 5, line 18 - page 7, line 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep12329 | [A] - N. FORESI ET AL, "Characterization of a Nitric Oxide Synthase from the Plant Kingdom: NO Generation from the Green Alga Ostreococcus tauri Is Light Irradiance and Growth Phase Dependent", THE PLANT CELL, US, (20101101), vol. 22, no. 11, doi:10.1105/tpc.109.073510, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 3816 - 3830, XP055264116 [A] 1-21 * page 3820, column 1, line 7 - page 3820, column 2, line 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.109.073510 | [A] - GOMMA AHMED E ET AL, "Improvement in Oil Production by Increasing Malonyl-CoA and Glycerol-3-Phosphate Pools inScenedesmus quadricauda", INDIAN JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY, HISAR, IN, vol. 55, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S12088-015-0546-4, ISSN 0046-8991, (20150807), pages 447 - 455, (20150807), XP035580072 [A] 1-21 * page 448, column 2, lines 7-23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12088-015-0546-4 | by applicant | US7939710 | US2012282676 | US2014256927 | - LEVITAN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2015), vol. 112, pages 412 - 417 | - MARECHAL, TECHNIQUES DE I' INGENIEUR, (2015), vol. 186, pages 1 - 19 | - ST LAURENT ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2015), vol. 1220, pages 339 - 345 | - TATUSOVA; MADDEN, FEMS MICROBIOL LETT, (1999), vol. 174, pages 247 - 250 | - BOWIE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1306 - 1310 | - "Heterotrophy of Carbon", DROOP, Algal Physiology and Biochemistry, Botanical Monographs, (1974), vol. 10, pages 530 - 559 | - GULDHE ET AL., FUEL, (2014), vol. 128, pages 46 - 52 | - SERA T., ADV DRUG DELIV REV, (2009), vol. 61, pages 513 - 526 | - MAEDER ET AL., NAT METHODS, (2013), vol. 10, pages 243 - 245 | - CHENG ET AL., CELL RES, (2013), vol. 23, pages 1163 - 1171 | - RUSSEL KIKKERT ET AL., PLANT CELL, TISSUE AND ORGAN CULTURE, (1993), vol. 33, no. 3, pages 221 - 226 | - FALCIATORE ET AL., BIOTECHNOL (NY, (199903), vol. 1, pages 239 - 251 | - ANANDARAJAH ET AL., APPLIED ENERGY, (2012), vol. 96, pages 371 - 377 | - BENVENUTI ET AL., J APPL PHYCOL, vol. 27, pages 1425 - 1431 | - SIAUT ET AL., GENE, (2007), vol. 406, no. 1-2, pages 23 - 35 | - ST LAURENT ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2015), vol. 1220, pages 339 - 45 | - SIMIONATO ET AL., EUKARYOT CELL, (2013), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 665 - 76 |