EP3414662 - VIRTUALIZING SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | ||
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOE, Sang Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
KARIVARADASWAMY, Sathyanarayanan Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington98052-6399 / US | 03 /
WILSON, Mei Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
SHEN, Fabin Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
LI, Yin Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2021/37] |
Former [2018/51] | 01 /
CHOE, Sang Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
KARIVARADASWAMY, Sathyanarayanan Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
WILSON, Mei Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
04 /
SHEN, Fabin Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
05 /
LI, Yin Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2018/51] | Application number, filing date | 17704983.0 | 06.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017US16757 | Priority number, date | US201662294929P | 12.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662294929 P | US201615235748 | 12.08.2016 Original published format: US201615235748 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017139235 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414662 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3414662 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
G06F9/5061 (EP,US);
G06F9/5077 (US);
G06F12/10 (US);
G06F9/5016 (US);
G06F9/5044 (US);
G06F2212/65 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIRTUALISIERUNG VON SENSOREN | [2018/51] | English: | VIRTUALIZING SENSORS | [2018/51] | French: | CAPTEURS DE VIRTUALISATION | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 13.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2017 | AL | 15.09.2021 | AT | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | ES | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | IT | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | MT | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | TR | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | IE | 06.02.2022 | LU | 06.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.02.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
TR | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.02.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.02.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.02.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.02.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.02.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.02.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.02.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
IT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.02.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 06.02.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
LU | 06.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
ES | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2010146620 (SIMERAL BRAD W [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0050] , [0056] - [0062] - [0065] , [0066] , [0082] - [0086] - [0092] , [0093] *; | [A]US2012084517 (POST BRADLEY STEPHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0066] - [0068] - [0087] , [0088] - [0092] - [0099] , [0104] - [0109] - [0113] - [0117] *; | [A]US2013311539 (NGAI ALAN HONKWAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,2 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0016] , [0017] , [0018] , [0026] - [0028] - [0039] *; | [A]US2013346584 (TAMESHIGE TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 4-6,11-13* paragraphs [0047] , [0068] , [0 97] *; | [A]US2014173595 (ANAND VAIJAYANTHIMALA K [US], et al) [A] 4-6,11-13 * paragraphs [0009] , [0037] , [0040] , [0041] , [0044] , [0045] *; | [I]US2015092008 (MANLEY PETER H [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0035] , [0039] , [0041] , [0042] , [0046] , [0068] , [0072] * |