EP3411408 - ANTI-ROR1 ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fred Hutchinson Cancer Center 1100 Fairview Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [2022/24] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Fred Hutchinson Cancer Research Center 1100 Fairview Avenue North Seattle, WA 98109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALAKRISHNAN, Ashwini 2904 4th Avenue W. Seattle, Washington 98119 / US | 02 /
HOFFSTROM, Benjamin, G. 1608 E. Republican Street Apartment 301 Seattle, Washington 98122 / US | 03 /
RANDOLPH-HABECKER, Julie 9721 12th Avenue NW Seattle, Washington 98117 / US | 04 /
RIDDELL, Stanley, R. 1763 268th Place SE Sammamish, Washington 98075 / US | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/50] | Application number, filing date | 17705745.2 | 02.02.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017US16300 | Priority number, date | US201662290337P | 02.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662290337 P | US201662324876P | 19.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662324876 P | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017136607 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3411408 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3411408 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P1/18, A61P11/00, A61P15/00, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P35/04 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4631 (EP);
A61K39/464462 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
G01N33/57492 (US);
C07K14/7051 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/92 (US);
C07K2319/03 (EP);
G01N2333/70503 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/50] | C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTI-ROR1-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/50] | English: | ANTI-ROR1 ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2018/50] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-ROR1 ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 31.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21204990.2 / EP4006056 | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.02.2017 | AL | 08.12.2021 | AT | 08.12.2021 | CY | 08.12.2021 | CZ | 08.12.2021 | DK | 08.12.2021 | EE | 08.12.2021 | FI | 08.12.2021 | HR | 08.12.2021 | LT | 08.12.2021 | LV | 08.12.2021 | MC | 08.12.2021 | MK | 08.12.2021 | MT | 08.12.2021 | NL | 08.12.2021 | PL | 08.12.2021 | RO | 08.12.2021 | RS | 08.12.2021 | SE | 08.12.2021 | SI | 08.12.2021 | SK | 08.12.2021 | SM | 08.12.2021 | TR | 08.12.2021 | IE | 02.02.2022 | LU | 02.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | CH | 28.02.2022 | LI | 28.02.2022 | BG | 08.03.2022 | NO | 08.03.2022 | GR | 09.03.2022 | IS | 08.04.2022 | PT | 08.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 02.02.2017 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
MK | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
TR | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.02.2022 | ||
LU | 02.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 02.02.2017 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
MK | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.02.2022 | ||
LU | 02.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 02.02.2017 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CY | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.02.2022 | ||
LU | 02.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.02.2017 | |
AL | 08.12.2021 | ||
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.02.2022 | ||
LU | 02.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.02.2022 | ||
LU | 02.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
IE | 02.02.2022 | ||
LU | 02.02.2022 | ||
CH | 28.02.2022 | ||
LI | 28.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SI | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 08.12.2021 | |
AT | 08.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
LU | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
DK | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
MC | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
IS | 08.04.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 08.12.2021 | |
CZ | 08.12.2021 | ||
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
PL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 08.12.2021 | |
EE | 08.12.2021 | ||
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SK | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 08.12.2021 | |
FI | 08.12.2021 | ||
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RO | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
PT | 08.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
SM | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
NL | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
NO | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
HR | 08.12.2021 | ||
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
LV | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
SE | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
GR | 09.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 08.12.2021 | |
LT | 08.12.2021 | ||
RS | 08.12.2021 | ||
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 08.12.2021 | |
BG | 08.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 08.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X] - YANG J ET AL, "Therapeutic potential and challenges of targeting receptor tyrosine kinase ROR1 with monoclonal antibodies in B-cell malignancies", vol. 6, no. 6, doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0021018, ISSN 1932-6203, (20110601), pages E21018.1 - E21018.15, PLOS ONE, PUBLIC LIBRARY OF SCIENCE, US, URL: http://www.plosone.org/article/info%3Adoi%2F10.1371%2Fjournal.pone.0021018, (20110615), XP002670875 [X] 71-80 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0021018 | [XY] - AMIR H DANESHMANESH ET AL, "Ror1, a cell surface receptor tyrosine kinase is expressed in chronic lymphocytic leukemia and may serve as a putative target for therapy", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US, vol. 123, no. 5, doi:10.1002/IJC.23587, ISSN 0020-7136, (20080901), pages 1190 - 1195, (20080610), XP002622341 [X] 2,21 * see paragraph "Production of anti-ROR1 and specificity testing" page 1191, RH column; see paragraph "Surface staining and flow cytometry" and "Dual color fluorescence in situ hybridization" page 1192, RH column; paragraph Discussion on page 1194, RH column, second paragraph * [Y] 1,3-20,22-70,81-87 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.23587 | [XY] - Daneshmanesh, "Phone ROR1 antibody (Receptor Tyrosine Kinase-Like Orphan Receptor 1) (C-Term) Antigen: Receptor Tyrosine Kinase-Like Orphan Receptor 1 (ROR1) 2 Images available", (20081231), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/18546292, (20170419), XP055365338 [X] 2,21 * see Item "immunogen" * [Y] 1,3-20,22-70,81-87 | [XY] - Anonymous, "Product Datasheet: ARP63925_P050 - ROR1 Antibody - C-terminal region (ARP63925_P050) - Aviva Systems Biology", (20160101), URL: http://www.avivasysbio.com/sd/tds/html_datasheet.php?sku=ARP63925_P050, (20170419), XP055365381 [X] 2,21 * the whole document * [Y] 1,3-20,22-70,81-87 | by applicant | CA114536 | CA138293 | US5283173 | US5468614 | US2013251642 | WO2014031687 | US9163258 | - HUDECEK ET AL., BLOOD, (2010), vol. 116, page 4532 | - HUDECEK ET AL., BLOOD, (2010), vol. 116, pages 4532 - 41 | - YANG ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, page E21018 | - HUDECEK ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES, (2013), vol. 19, page 3153 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1977), vol. 25, page 3389 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, page 403 | - GHAHROUDI ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1997), vol. 414, page 521 | - VINCKE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2009), vol. 284, page 3273 | - HAMERS-CASTERMAN ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 363, page 446 | - NGUYEN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 275, page 413 | - ROUX ET AL., PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. (USA), (1998), vol. 95, page 11804 | - NGUYEN ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (2002), vol. 54, page 39 | - HERRIN ET AL., PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (2008), vol. 105, page 2040 | - ALDER ET AL., NATURE IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 9, page 319 | - JESPERS ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 22, page 1161 | - CORTEZ-RETAMOZO ET AL., CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, page 2853 | - BARAL ET AL., NATURE MED., (2006), vol. 12, page 580 | - BARTHELEMY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 283, page 3639 | - AL-LAZIKANI ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948 | - MACCALLUM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 262, pages 732 - 745 | - LEFRANC MP ET AL., DEV. COMP. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 7, pages 55 - 77 | - J. MOL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 309, pages 657 - 70 | - CAPON ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 337, page 525 | - SCATCHARD ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1949), vol. 51, page 660 | - WILSON, SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 295, page 2103 | - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, page 2560 | - YANG ET AL., PLOSONE, (2011), vol. 6, page E21018 | - HUDECEK ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2013), vol. 19, page 3153 | - SCHOLTEN ET AL., CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 119, pages 135 - 145 | - KIM ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, page E18556 | - NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2001), vol. 29, page E45 | - ZHANG ET AL., SCI. REP., (2014), vol. 24, page 5811 | - DAVE ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, page E52655 | - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2012), page 348 | - ZHANG ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (2012), vol. 181, page 1903 | - LEISEGANG ET AL., J. MOL. MED., (2008), vol. 86, page 573 | - BERGER ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. RES., (2015), vol. 3, page 206 | - ZHANG ET AL., SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (2014), vol. 4, page 5811 | - ZHANG ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, page E31127 | - CUI ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2013), vol. 73, page 3649 | - CHIEN ET AL., VIRCHOWS ARCHIV, (2016), vol. 468, page 589 | - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2012), vol. 21, page 348 | - KARACHALIOU ET AL., TRANSLATIONAL LUNG CANCER RESEARCH, (2014), vol. 3, page 122 | - ZHANG ET AL., THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, (2012), vol. 181, page 1903 | - LIU ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2015), vol. 10, page E0127092 | - MORGAN ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY, (2010), vol. 18, page 843 | - LAMERS ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY, (2013), vol. 21, page 904 | - HASSAN ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 13, page 5144 | - BASKAR ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 14, page 396 | - FUKUDA ET AL., PNAS, (2008), vol. 105, page 3047 | - CHOI ET AL., CLINICAL LYMPHOMA, MYELOMA & LEUKEMIA, (2015), vol. 15, page S167 | - BERGER ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOLOGY RESEARCH, (2015), vol. 3, page 206 | - KAUCKA ET AL., ACTA PHYSIOLOGICA, (2011), vol. 203, page 351 | - HUDECEK ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2013), vol. 19, page 3153 | - ZARITSKAYA ET AL., EXPERT REVIEW OF VACCINES, (2010), vol. 9, page 601 |