EP3410886 - APPARATUSES AND SYSTEMS FOR CLOSURE OF FOOTWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Factor 10 LLC 725 Magazine Street Suite C New Orleans, Louisiana 70130 / US | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOPER, Luke 1205 4th Street New Orleans, Louisiana 70130 / US | 02 /
DRAVES, Valerie 4314 Sheffield Rd. Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US | 03 /
WHITSELL, Daniel 200 Wood Forge Circle Lebanon, Ohio 45036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | 01 /
HOOPER, Luke 1205 4th Street New Orleans, Louisiana 70130 / US | ||
02 /
DRAVES, Valerie 4924 Camden Road, Apt. A Madison, Wisconsin 53716 / US | |||
03 /
WHITSELL, Daniel 200 Wood Forge Circle Lebanon, Ohio 45036 / US | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 17705755.1 | 06.02.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017US16728 | Priority number, date | US201662291977P | 05.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662291977 P | US201662327090P | 25.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662327090 P | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017136836 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3410886 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A43C11/00, A43C11/14 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
A43C11/1493 (EP,US);
A43C1/02 (CN);
A43B1/0054 (US);
A43B13/12 (US);
A43B13/14 (CN,US);
A43B3/126 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME ZUM VERSCHLUSS VON SCHUHWERK | [2018/50] | English: | APPARATUSES AND SYSTEMS FOR CLOSURE OF FOOTWEAR | [2018/50] | French: | APPAREILS ET SYSTÈMES DE FERMETURE DE CHAUSSURE | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 03.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/20] | 03.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE20112330U (CHOU LUNG CHIAO [TW]) [A] 1 * figure *; | [XA]US2004072482 (RUNYAN MAX R [US]) [X] 25-30 * figures 1,2,3,5,6,8 * [A] 1; | [T]US2005081404 (HURD JOHN [US], et al) [T] 1,2,25,27* figure 1a *; | [A]WO2009134858 (NIKE INTERNATIONAL LTD [US], et al) [A] 1,25 * figures 1-10 *; | [T]DE102009023689 (NEWSHOE GMBH [DE]) [T] 1,2,25,27 * the whole document *; | [XAI] - Susan Anderson, "Vedante POP BANDS(TM) | Fun and Safety for Halloween: Super-Reflective, Colorful Way to Make Goblins Visible to Cars at Night", (20141008), URL: http://www.prweb.com/releases/halloween/2014/prweb12225212.htm, (20170426), XP055367523 [X] 25,27,28,30 * the whole document * [A] 1 [I] 26,29 |