EP3414406 - COMPOSITE HEAT INSULATION SYSTEM THAT CAN BE DISMANTLED AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION AND REMOVAL THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Weber GmbH Schanzenstrasse 84 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POPRAWA, Christian Ringstraße 77d 42489 Wülfrath / DE | 02 /
KOLBE, Georg Johannes Kirchhellener Straße 4 46236 Bottrop / DE | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Mertzlufft-Paufler, Cornelius, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2018/51] | Application number, filing date | 17705794.0 | 09.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017EP00183 | Priority number, date | DE20161001563 | 12.02.2016 Original published format: DE102016001563 | [2018/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017137164 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414406 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3414406 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/76, E04F13/04 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
E04B1/762 (EP,RU);
E04B1/7629 (RU);
E04F13/02 (RU);
E04F13/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKBAUFÄHIGES WÄRMEDÄMMVERBUNDSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND ENTFERNUNG | [2018/51] | English: | COMPOSITE HEAT INSULATION SYSTEM THAT CAN BE DISMANTLED AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION AND REMOVAL THEREOF | [2018/51] | French: | SYSTÈME COMPOSITE D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE APTE AU DÉMANTÈLEMENT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE POSE ET D'ENLÈVEMENT | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 12.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2022/07] |
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3444815 (NOHLEN WOLFGANG) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [XA]DE202010007659U (ZIMMERMANN & REICHEL FARBENFAB [DE]) [X] 5,7,9,10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-4,11,12 |