EP3417026 - MAKING ADHESIVE SILICONE SUBSTANCES ADHERE TO FLUOROPOLYMER FILMS USING A CORONA TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Strasse 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNT, Stephan Veilchenweg 18 22529 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
HÄHNEL, Marcel Dorfstraße 123 25336 Klein Nordende / DE | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 17706189.2 | 16.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017EP53494 | Priority number, date | DE201610202396 | 17.02.2016 Original published format: DE102016202396 | [2018/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017140775 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3417026 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/00, C09J5/02, C09J143/04, C09J183/00 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
C09J5/02 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/24 (EP,KR,US);
B05D1/40 (US);
B05D3/007 (US);
B05D3/144 (US);
B05D5/10 (US);
B05D7/04 (US);
B29C33/68 (US);
C09J183/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09J143/04 (EP,US);
C09J2301/416 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2427/006 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2483/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Title | German: | VERANKERUNG VON SILIKONKLEBMASSEN AUF FLUORPOLYMERFOLIEN DURCH CORONABEHANDLUNG | [2018/52] | English: | MAKING ADHESIVE SILICONE SUBSTANCES ADHERE TO FLUOROPOLYMER FILMS USING A CORONA TREATMENT | [2018/52] | French: | ANCRAGE DE SUBSTANCES ADHÉSIVES AU SILICONE SUR DES FILMS FLUOROPOLYMÈRES PAR TRAITEMENT CORONA | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 17.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2006172140 (KURODA YASUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * page 1, paragraphs 2,12 * * page 6, paragraphs 63-68 * [Y] 4,7,9,10; | [XY]US2009012218 (KURODA YASUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * page 6, paragraphs 80-85 * [Y] 4,7,9,10; | [Y]WO2012152710 (TESA SE [DE], et al) [Y] 4,7 * claims 1-3,7 *; | [YD]WO2015014646 (TESA SE [DE]) [YD] 9,10 * page 1, lines 9-11 * * page 4, lines 24-27 * * page 6, lines 25-35 * * page 7, lines 10-14 * * page 8, lines 1-14 * * page 9, lines 11-30 ** page 10, lines 23-25 * | by applicant | DE10347025 | DE102005027391 | DE102007063021 | DE102011075470 | CN103421200 | WO2015014646 | - WAGNER ET AL., VACUUM, (2003), vol. 71, pages 417 - 436 |