Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019202859 | ![]() | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11905310 | ![]() | 20.02.2024 | B2 | US2021323999 | 21.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815999655 | 20.08.2018 | US202117327865 | 24.05.2021 | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102728998B | ![]() | 11.11.2024 | B1 | KR20180128910 | 04.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6911040B | ![]() | 28.07.2021 | B2 | JP2019509998 | 11.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL261040 | ![]() | 29.07.2021 | B | IL261040 | 31.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3730511 | ![]() | 20.09.2023 | B1 | EP3730511 | 28.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | EP17706215 | 17.02.2017 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108779143B | ![]() | 12.08.2022 | B | CN108779143 | 09.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3014488 | ![]() | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017220675B | ![]() | 16.11.2023 | B2 | AU2017220675 | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3416974 | ![]() | 29.07.2020 | B1 | EP3416974 | 26.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018016742 | 26.12.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO2018009057 | 13.11.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1123802T | 24.03.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3416974T | 07.09.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3730511T | 30.10.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | EP17706215 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA038538 | 13.09.2021 | B1 | EA201891878 | 31.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2822918T | 05.05.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20201415T | 27.11.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | EP17706215 | 17.02.2017 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20231432T | 01.03.2024 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP20179961 | 17.02.2017 | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3416974T | 10.12.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018009829 | 11.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY186560 | 27.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3416974T | 14.12.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | EP17706215 | 17.02.2017 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2018133009 | 19.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201806852P | 27.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3416974T | 30.11.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | EP17706215 | 17.02.2017 | WO2017EP53677 | 17.02.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3730511T | 29.12.2023 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP20179961 | 17.02.2017 | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017140881 | ![]() | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2018002373 | 07.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2960723T | 06.03.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI3730511T | 31.10.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201602938D0 | 06.04.2016 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE050774T | 28.01.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE064240T | 28.02.2024 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3730511T | 25.10.2023 | T | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3730511T | 11.03.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3416974T | 11.08.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3730511T | 23.10.2023 | T | Priority number | Date | GB201602938 | 19.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | EP3730511 |