EP3408248 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING 2-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUOROPROPENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEUR-BERT, Dominique 284F Chemin du Montellier 69390 Charly / FR | 02 /
GARRAIT, Dominique 874 Route du Bas Privas 69390 Charly / FR | 03 /
PIGAMO, Anne 9 Rue de la Chapelle de Bel Air 69340 Francheville / FR | 04 /
WENDLINGER, Laurent 18 Hameau des Pierres Blanches 69510 Soucieu en Jarrest / FR | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/49] | Leca, François Michel ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17706527.3 | 13.01.2017 | [2018/49] | WO2017FR50079 | Priority number, date | FR20160050673 | 28.01.2016 Original published format: FR 1650673 | [2018/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017129878 | Date: | 03.08.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3408248 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/20, C07C17/25, C07C21/18 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
C07C17/25 (EP,US);
B01J27/125 (US);
C07C17/206 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C21/18 (US,EP);
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-CHLOR-3,3,3-TRIFLUORPROPEN | [2018/49] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING 2-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUOROPROPENE | [2018/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DU 2-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUOROPROPENE | [2018/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 16.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/08] | 30.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2009015317 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * pages 5-7 * * claims 1-6 *; | [X]EP2336102 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9 * page 4, paragraph 0023 * * page 5, paragraph 0030 * * example 23; table 1 * * page 7, paragraph 0032 *; | [A]WO2012052798 (ARKEMA FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4 ** example 1 * |