EP3416712 - A BREATHING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rehaler ApS Nordre Strandvej 182A 3140 Ålsgårde / DK | [2022/10] |
Former [2018/52] | For all designated states Balancair APS c/o Scion DTU Diplomvej 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTHEL-JACOBSEN, Erik Turbinevej 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | 02 /
JOHANSEN, Asger Islands Brygge 24A 4. tv. 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | 03 /
JOHANSEN, Troels Absalonsgade 26 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2022/19] |
Former [2018/52] | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 17706681.8 | 16.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017DK50043 | Priority number, date | DK20160070086 | 16.02.2016 Original published format: DK 201670086 | DK20160070900 | 11.11.2016 Original published format: DK 201670900 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017140322 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3416712 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3416712 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
A61M16/0045 (EP,KR,US);
A61M16/0078 (EP,KR,US);
A61M16/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61M16/201 (EP);
A61M16/20 (US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Extension states | BA | 14.09.2018 | ME | 14.09.2018 | Validation states | MA | 14.09.2018 | MD | 14.09.2018 | Title | German: | BEATMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/52] | English: | A BREATHING DEVICE | [2018/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RESPIRATION | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 14.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22173771.1 / EP4082592 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 28.05.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/50] | 01.02.2022 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/50] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.05.2022 | AT | 18.05.2022 | CZ | 18.05.2022 | DK | 18.05.2022 | EE | 18.05.2022 | ES | 18.05.2022 | FI | 18.05.2022 | HR | 18.05.2022 | IT | 18.05.2022 | LT | 18.05.2022 | LV | 18.05.2022 | MC | 18.05.2022 | NL | 18.05.2022 | PL | 18.05.2022 | RO | 18.05.2022 | RS | 18.05.2022 | SE | 18.05.2022 | SI | 18.05.2022 | SK | 18.05.2022 | SM | 18.05.2022 | BG | 18.08.2022 | NO | 18.08.2022 | GR | 19.08.2022 | IS | 18.09.2022 | PT | 19.09.2022 | GB | 16.02.2023 | IE | 16.02.2023 | LU | 16.02.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
GB | 16.02.2023 | ||
IE | 16.02.2023 | ||
LU | 16.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
LU | 16.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
MC | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SI | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 18.05.2022 | |
AT | 18.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
CZ | 18.05.2022 | ||
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
EE | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RO | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
SK | 18.05.2022 | ||
SM | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
DK | 18.05.2022 | ||
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
IS | 18.09.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
PL | 18.05.2022 | ||
RS | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
HR | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
LV | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
BG | 18.08.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
GR | 19.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
NL | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 18.05.2022 | |
ES | 18.05.2022 | ||
FI | 18.05.2022 | ||
LT | 18.05.2022 | ||
SE | 18.05.2022 | ||
NO | 18.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB571555 (CHRISTIAN JAMES LAMBERTSEN); | [X]US2652830 (KOZA RALPH H, et al); | [X]US3097642 (RUSSELL ALLAN M); | [X]US4301810 (BELMAN MICHAEL J); | [X]US4628926 (DUNCAN DAVID T [US], et al); | [X]US2006130839 (BASSOVITCH OLEG [AU]); | [X]EP2338575 (TRUDELL MEDICAL INT [CA]); | [X]US2012240935 (JOHANSEN TROELS [DK]); | [X]US2013172768 (LEHMAN EDWARD [US]) |