EP3419940 - ALKALI-FREE BOROALUMINO SILICATE GLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2019/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLISON, Adam James 70 E. 5th Street Corning, New York 14830 / US | 02 /
GOMEZ, Sinue 228 Upper Delevan Avenue Corning, New York 14830 / US | 03 /
KATO, Yoshiaki 11-182 Chung Cheng Road Sec. 2 Shih Lin Taipei Shih Lin 111 / TW | [2019/01] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2023/41] |
Former [2019/01] | Elkington & Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 17706943.2 | 13.02.2017 | [2019/01] | WO2017US17617 | Priority number, date | US201662298246P | 22.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662298246 P | [2019/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017146926 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3419940 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3419940 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/091, C03C3/093 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
C03C3/091 (EP,KR,US);
C03B17/064 (US);
C03C3/087 (KR);
C03C3/093 (EP,US);
C03C4/00 (KR);
G02F1/13 (KR);
C03C2203/10 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALKALIFREIE BORALUMINOSILIKATGLÄSER | [2019/01] | English: | ALKALI-FREE BOROALUMINO SILICATE GLASSES | [2019/01] | French: | VERRES DE BOROALUMINOSILICATE EXEMPTS D'ALCALIS | [2019/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/01] | 13.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23175141.3 / EP4234504 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2009294773 (ELLISON ADAM JAMES [US]) [X] 1-32 * paragraphs [0061] , [0067]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2014179510 (ALLAN DOUGLAS CLIPPINGER [US], et al) [X] 1-32* paragraph [0083]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2014264356 (ELLISON ADAM JAMES [US]) [X] 1-32 * paragraphs [0092] , [0120]; example -; claim - * | Examination | WO2017091981 | EP3385234 | by applicant | US3338696 | US3682609 |