EP3423469 - NEW TRIFLUOROMETHYLPROPANAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS HTRA1 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORNSPERGER, Benoit c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 02 /
IACONE, Roberto c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 03 /
MAERKI, Hans P. c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 04 /
MOHR, Peter c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 05 /
REUTLINGER, Michael c/o F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Bernard, Guillaume F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 17707059.6 | 01.03.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017EP54677 | Priority number, date | EP20160158637 | 04.03.2016 Original published format: EP 16158637 | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017148964 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3423469 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/062, C07K5/083, C07K5/078, C07K5/065, C07K5/068, C07K5/072, A61K31/4402, A61P27/00 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
C07K5/0806 (EP,US);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
C07K5/06086 (EP,US);
C07K5/06121 (EP,US);
C07K5/06139 (EP,US);
C07K5/06191 (EP,US);
C07K5/0804 (US);
C07K5/081 (EP,US);
C07K5/0812 (EP,US);
C07K5/0815 (EP,US);
C07K5/0819 (EP,US);
C07K5/0821 (EP,US);
C07K5/0827 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Title | German: | NEUE TRIFLUORMETHYLPROPANAMIDDERIVATE ALS HTRA1-INHIBITOREN | [2019/02] | English: | NEW TRIFLUOROMETHYLPROPANAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS HTRA1 INHIBITORS | [2019/02] | French: | NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS DE TRIFLUOROMÉTHYLPROPANAMIDE UTILISÉS COMME INHIBITEURS DE HTRA1 | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 04.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/43] | 13.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0061542 (CYTOVIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-53 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US2005027101 (GUTHEIL WILLIAM G [US]) [X] 1-40 * Coupling of Tyr-Ala-Phe with CF3-CH(OH)-CH(CH3)-NH2, followed by oxidation to the ketone; paragraph [0117]; figure 7 *; | [X] - SASUBILLI RAMAKRISHNA ET AL, "General inverse solid-phase synthesis method for C-terminally modified peptide mimetics", JOURNAL OF COMBINATORIAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, vol. 6, no. 6, doi:10.1021/CC049912D, ISSN 1520-4766, (20041101), pages 911 - 915, (20040928), XP002522469 [X] 1-40 * Scheme 3 and 1st peptide of table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cc049912d | [A] - LINDA TRUEBESTEIN ET AL, "Substrate-induced remodeling of the active site regulates human HTRA1 activity", NATURE STRUCTURAL & MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (20110206), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1038/nsmb.2013, ISSN 1545-9993, pages 386 - 388, XP055124206 [A] 1-53 * figure 2c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nsmb.2013 | [A] - JACOBO SARAH MELISSA P ET AL, "Focus on Molecules: HtrA1 and neovascular AMD", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, (20100717), vol. 94, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.EXER.2010.07.006, ISSN 0014-4835, pages 4 - 5, XP028884160 [A] 1-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2010.07.006 |