EP3429795 - LASER WELDING OF STEEL WITH POWER MODULATION FOR HOT-CRACKING PREVENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRUMPF Laser- und Systemtechnik GmbH Johann-Maus-Str. 2 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2019/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEKER, Nicolai Buchenweg 11 74385 Pleidelsheim / DE | 02 /
SCHÄFER, Marcel Baumgartenstrasse 5 72393 Burladingen / DE | 03 /
SCHEIBLE, Philipp Hausgasse 17/1 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 04 /
GRAF, Thomas Schauinslandstraße 45 71154 Nufringen / DE | 05 /
STRITT, Peter Mozartstr. 18/3 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2020/29] |
Former [2019/07] | 01 /
SPEKER, Nicolai Buchenweg 11 74385 Pleidelsheim / DE | ||
02 /
SCHÄFER, Marcel Hausgasse 17/1 71254 Ditzingen / DE | |||
03 /
SCHEIBLE, Philipp Elly-Heuss-Knapp-Weg 16 75428 Illingen / DE | |||
04 /
GRAF, Thomas Schauinslandstraße 45 71154 Nufringen / DE | |||
05 /
STRITT, Peter Mozartstr. 18/3 71229 Leonberg / DE | |||
Former [2019/04] | 01 /
SPEKER, Nicolai Buchenweg 11 74385 Pleidelsheim / DE | ||
02 /
SCHÄFER, Marcel Hausgasse 17/1 71254 Ditzingen / DE | |||
03 /
SCHEIBLE, Philipp Elly-Heuss-Knapp-Weg 16 75428 Illingen / DE | |||
04 /
GRAF, Thomas Schauinslandstraße 45 71154 Nufringen / DE | |||
05 /
STRITT, Peter Hasenbergstr. 95A 70176 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/04] | Application number, filing date | 17707322.8 | 27.02.2017 | [2019/04] | WO2017EP54464 | Priority number, date | DE201610204578 | 18.03.2016 Original published format: DE102016204578 | [2019/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017157644 | Date: | 21.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429795 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3429795 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/06 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
B23K26/0626 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/06 (EP,US);
B23K26/0869 (KR);
B23K26/24 (US);
B23K26/32 (US);
B23K2103/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERSCHWEISSEN VON STAHL MIT LEISTUNGSMODULATION ZUR HEISSRISSVERMEIDUNG | [2019/47] | English: | LASER WELDING OF STEEL WITH POWER MODULATION FOR HOT-CRACKING PREVENTION | [2019/04] | French: | SOUDAGE D'ACIER AU LASER AVEC MODULATION DE PUISSANCE POUR ÉVITER LA FISSURATION À CHAUD | [2019/04] |
Former [2019/04] | LASERSCHWEIßEN VON STAHL MIT LEISTUNGSMODULATION ZUR HEIßRISSVERMEIDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/04] | 18.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2017 | AL | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 27.02.2017 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004026381 (TSUKAMOTO SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0012] , [0025] , [0026] , [0032] * * claims 1,2,4,6 *; | [A] - HEIDER ANDREAS ET AL, "Power modulation to stabilize laser welding of copper", JOURNAL OF LASER APPLICATIONS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, 2 HUNTINGTON QUADRANGLE, MELVILLE, NY 11747, (20150116), vol. 27, no. 2, doi:10.2351/1.4906127, XP012193695 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2351/1.4906127 | by applicant | JPH09108872 | US6483072 | US6900410 | DE60111790T | DE102009056592 | DE102012021755 | - M. SCHNEIDER, "Von Werkzeugstahl bis zur Superlegierung", LASER-JOURNAL, (201304), pages 24 - 27 | - A. HEIDER ET AL., JOURNAL OF LASER APPLICATIONS, vol. 27, no. 2 |