EP3424268 - METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF A TRANSPARENT LENS FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE LIGHTING AND/OR SIGNALLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Vision 34 rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAOUCHER, Erwan C/O VALEO VISION 26 Boulevard de l'Industrie Zone Industrielle Ecouflant Angers 49000 Angers / FR | 02 /
GRATECAP, François C/O VALEO VISION 26 Boulevard de l'Industrie Zone Industrielle Ecouflant Angers 49000 Angers / FR | 03 /
JUTON, Michel C/O VALEO VISION 26 Boulevard de l'Industrie Zone Industrielle Ecouflant Angers 49000 Angers / FR | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Valeo Visibility IP Department 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Valeo Vision IP Department 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | Application number, filing date | 17707854.0 | 28.02.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017EP54595 | Priority number, date | FR20160051668 | 29.02.2016 Original published format: FR 1651668 | [2019/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017148914 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3424268 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/84 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
H05B3/84 (EP);
H05B2203/017 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER TRANSPARENTEN LINSE FÜR EINE BELEUCHTUNGS- UND/ODER SIGNALISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2019/02] | English: | METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF A TRANSPARENT LENS FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE LIGHTING AND/OR SIGNALLING DEVICE | [2019/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE GLACE TRANSPARENTE POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE ET/OU DE SIGNALISATION POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 03.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4920254 (DECAMP HOWARD S [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 9, line 24 - column 10, line 46; figures 1,3; claim 10.16 *; | [Y]DE4019703 (RENKER GMBH & CO KG ZWEIGNIEDE [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 12; figures 5,6 *; | [A]WO2006091955 (EXATEC LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0041]; figure 6 *; | [A]EP2148337 (TESA AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0064] - [0068]; figure 1 *; | [XYI]DE102014109030 (FARBODFAR HOUMAN [CA], et al) [X] 10-13 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045]; figures 4,5,8 * * paragraphs [0051] , [0052] * [Y] 1-9 [I] 14 |