Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3424268 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1651668 | 29.02.2016 | WO2017EP54595 | 28.02.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017148914 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1651668 | 29.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3048327 | 02.10.2020 | B1 | FR3048327 | 01.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1651668 | 29.02.2016 |