EP3405486 - A METHOD OF GENERATING A SYNTHETIC ANTIBODY LIBRARY, SAID LIBRARY AND APPLICATION(S) THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zumutor Biologics, Inc. 100 Trade Center Century Suites, Suite G-700 Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATTERJEE, Sohang 12453 Main Campus Drive Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 02 /
IYER RODRIGUES, Kavitha Apartment No. 121B Sobha Magnolia Bannerghatta Road Bangalore Karnataka 560029 / IN | 03 /
GHOSH, Maloy D 903 NCC Urban Aster Park 5/2 Mandala Kunte Yelahanka New Town Bangalore Karnataka 560064 / IN | 04 /
MAITY, Sunit 8A/ 25 Nandi Garden Phase 1 JP Nagar 9th Phase, Anjanapura Bangalore Karnataka 560062 / IN | 05 /
UNNIKRISHNAN, Divya No. 44 4th Cross 4th Block Nandini Layout Bangalore Karnataka 560096 / IN | 06 /
MANJUNATH BANGALORE MUNIRAJU, Yogendra 85 1st 'C' Cross Road RMV 2nd Stage 3rd Block Devasandra Bangalore Karnataka 560054 / IN | 07 /
MURUGESAN, Sathyabalan No.52 4th Cross Duggalamma Layout Rajagoplal Nagar Laggre, Peenya III Phase Bangalore Karnataka 560058 / IN | 08 /
MUKUNDA, Pavithra 1-171-1A Mathra Smurthi Near Prabhakar Tiles Ferry Road Kundapur Karnataka 576201 / IN | 09 /
PRASAD, Bhargav New No. 6 1st Street 5/55 3rd Main Road Kannadasan Nagar Kodungaiyur Chennai Tamil Nadu 600118 / IN | 10 /
KAMANAGOWDA, Veeresha No. 682 2nd Block Kanteeravanagar Nandini Layout Post Bangalore Karnataka 560096 / IN | 11 /
BHATTACHARJEE, Sanghamitra G-07 Bloomingdale Apartments 1st Main 11th Cross Near Corporation Bank Pai Layout Old Madras Road, Doorvaninagar, Bangalore North Bangalore Karnataka 560016 / IN | 12 /
KUMAR DAKSHINAMURTHY, Pravin No.32 MGR Nagar 1st Street Velachery Chennai Tamil Nadu 600042 / IN | 13 /
HALAN, Vivek 619 Jakkanarai Thumboor Village Jackanarai The Nilgiris Aravenu Tamil Nadu 643201 / IN | 14 /
SRINIVASAN, Sankaranarayanan E-504 Jalvayu Heights Opp. Jal Soudha Jalahalli HMT Main Road Bangalore Karnataka 560013 / IN | 15 /
HORA, Anuradha H. No. 706 Church Road Civil Lines Sitapur Uttar Pradesh 261001 / IN | 16 /
NATARAJAN, Bairavabalakumar 175A Velan Nagar Valasaravakkam Chennai Tamil Nadu 600087 / IN | 17 /
NAIR, Karthika P-6 Senior Officers Enclave Head Quarters Training Command Indian Air Force J.C Nagar Post Bangalore Karnataka 560006 / IN | 18 /
THANIGAIVEL, Aswini 29 Vellala Street 2nd Floor Aminjikarai Tamil Nadu Chennai 600029 / IN | 19 /
MALIWALAVE, Amol 239 2nd Floor 5th Main 1st Block Valagerahalli, Nanabharathi PO, Kengeriupanagar Bangalore Karnataka 560056 / IN | 20 /
RAVINDRA SHENOY, Bharath 74/94 9th Cross 4th Main Bapujinagar Bangalore Karnataka 560026 / IN | 21 /
BHIMA RAO, Sahana 109 F1 Srikupa Apartments 3rd Cross Sri Venkateshwara Krupa Layout Bangalore Karnataka 560079 / IN | 22 /
PRAKASH CHAKRABARTY, Subhra 202 444 Premanilaya 4th Cross 12th Main Canara bank Layout, Sahakar Nagar Bangalore Karnataka 560097 / IN | 23 /
KUMAR DUBEY, Ashvini 71/C Canara Bank Layout Vidyaranyapura Bangalore Karnataka 560097 / IN | 24 /
KHAN, Amir 1018 Street No 7 Patwari Nagla Baroli Road Aligarh Uttar Pradesh 202002 / IN | 25 /
SHARMA, Ankurina Flat No 203 Chalet Apts 13th Cross Malleshwaram Bangalore Karnataka 560003 / IN | 26 /
SHARMA, Rashmi 28 T/3 Vishnu Garden Kankhal Uttarakhand Haridwar 249407 / IN | 27 /
TIWARI, Anurag C398 VDA Colony 1st Phase Lamni Badalalpur Varanasi Uttar Pradesh 221007 / IN | 28 /
KUMAR, Santosh c/o. Lakhan Ram H.No. 16 Goriyachu Jharkhand Charki Giridih / IN | 29 /
PATEL, Shivani H No. 4205/3 Neta Coloney Subhash ward adhartal Road No. 4 Jabalpur Adhartal Madhya Pradesh 482004 / IN | 30 /
MARKANDA, Nikitha 145 5th Cross Babu Reddy Layout Bhuvaneshwari Nagar Bangalore North, R T Nagar Bangalore Karnataka 560032 / IN | [2019/11] |
Former [2018/48] | 01 /
CHATTERJEE, Sohang 12453 Main Campus Drive Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | ||
02 /
IYER RODRIGUES, Kavitha Apartment No. 121B Sobha Magnolia Bannerghatta Road Bangalore Karnataka 560029 / IN | |||
03 /
GHOSH, Maloy D 903 NCC Urban Aster Park 5/2 Mandala Kunte Yelahanka New Town Bangalore Karnataka 560064 / IN | |||
04 /
MAITY, Sunit 8A/ 25 Nandi Garden Phase 1 JP Nagar 9th Phase, Anjanapura Bangalore Karnataka 560062 / IN | |||
05 /
UNNIKRISHNAN, Divya No. 44 4th Cross 4th Block Nandini Layout Bangalore Karnataka 560096 / IN | |||
06 /
MANJUNATH BANGALORE MUNIRAJU, Yogendra 85 1st 'C' Cross Road RMV 2nd Stage 3rd Block Devasandra Bangalore Karnataka 560054 / IN | |||
07 /
MURUGESAN, Sathyabalan No.52 4th Cross Duggalamma Layout Rajagoplal Nagar Laggre, Peenya III Phase Bangalore Karnataka 560058 / IN | |||
08 /
MUKUNDA, Pavithra 1-171-1A Mathra Smurthi Near Prabhakar Tiles Ferry Road Kundapur Karnataka 576201 / IN | |||
09 /
PRASAD, Bhargav New No. 6 1st Street 5/55 3rd Main Road Kannadasan Nagar Kodungaiyur Chennai Tamil Nadu 600118 / IN | |||
10 /
KAMANAGOWDA, Veeresha No. 682 2nd Block Kanteeravanagar Nandini Layout Post Bangalore Karnataka 560096 / IN | |||
11 /
BHATTACHARJEE, Sanghamitra G-07 Bloomingdale Apartments 1st Main 11th Cross Near Corporation Bank Pai Layout Old Madras Road, Doorvaninagar, Bangalore North Bangalore Karnataka 560016 / IN | |||
12 /
KUMAR DAKSHINAMURTHY, Pravin No.32 MGR Nagar 1st Street Velachery Chennai Tamil Nadu 600042 / IN | |||
13 /
HALAN, Vivek 619 Jakkanarai Thumboor Village Jackanarai The Nilgiris Aravenu Tamil Nadu 643201 / IN | |||
14 /
SRINIVASAN, Sankaranarayanan E-504 Jalvayu Heights Opp. Jal Soudha Jalahalli HMT Main Road Bangalore Karnataka 560013 / IN | |||
15 /
HORA, Anuradha H. No. 706 Church Road Civil Lines Sitapur Uttar Pradesh 261001 / IN | |||
16 /
NATARAJAN, Bairavabalakumar 175A Velan Nagar Valasaravakkam Chennai Tamil Nadu 600087 / IN | |||
17 /
NAIR, Karthika P-6 Senior Officers Enclave Head Quarters Training Command Indian Air Force J.C Nagar Post Bangalore Karnataka 560006 / IN | |||
18 /
THANIGAIVEL, Aswini 29 Vellala Street 2nd Floor Aminjikarai Chennai Tamil Nadu 600029 / IN | |||
19 /
MALIWALAVE, Amol 239 2nd Floor 5th Main 1st Block Valagerahalli, Nanabharathi PO, Kengeriupanagar Bangalore Karnataka 560056 / IN | |||
20 /
RAVINDRA SHENOY, Bharath 74/94 9th Cross 4th Main Bapujinagar Bangalore Karnataka 560026 / IN | |||
21 /
BHIMA RAO, Sahana 109 F1 Srikupa Apartments 3rd Cross Sri Venkateshwara Krupa Layout Bangalore Karnataka 560079 / IN | |||
22 /
PRAKASH CHAKRABARTY, Subhra 202 444 Premanilaya 4th Cross 12th Main Canara bank Layout, Sahakar Nagar Bangalore Karnataka 560097 / IN | |||
23 /
KUMAR DUBEY, Ashvini 71/C Canara Bank Layout Vidyaranyapura Bangalore Karnataka 560097 / IN | |||
24 /
KHAN, Amir 1018 Street No 7 Patwari Nagla Baroli Road Aligarh Uttar Pradesh 202002 / IN | |||
25 /
SHARMA, Ankurina Flat No 203 Chalet Apts 13th Cross Malleshwaram Bangalore Karnataka 560003 / IN | |||
26 /
SHARMA, Rashmi 28 T/3 Vishnu Garden Kankhal Uttarakhand Haridwar 249407 / IN | |||
27 /
TIWARI, Anurag C398 VDA Colony 1st Phase Lamni Badalalpur Varanasi Uttar Pradesh 221007 / IN | |||
28 /
KUMAR, Santosh c/o. Lakhan Ram H.No. 16 Goriyachu Jharkhand Charki Giridih / IN | |||
29 /
PATEL, Shivani H No. 4205/3 Neta Coloney Subhash ward adhartal Road No. 4 Jabalpur Adhartal Madhya Pradesh 482004 / IN | |||
30 /
MARKANDA, Nikitha 145 5th Cross Babu Reddy Layout Bhuvaneshwari Nagar Bangalore North, R T Nagar Bangalore Karnataka 560032 / IN | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/48] | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17707950.6 | 19.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017IB50280 | Priority number, date | IN201641001955 | 19.01.2016 Original published format: IN201641001955 | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017125871 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3405486 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, C40B40/02 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
C07K16/005 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/1037 (KR,US);
C40B40/02 (EP,KR,US);
C40B40/08 (US);
C40B40/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER BIBLIOTHEK VON SYNTHETISCHEN ANTIKÖRPERN, BESAGTE BIBLIOTHEK UND ANWENDUNG(EN) DAVON | [2018/48] | English: | A METHOD OF GENERATING A SYNTHETIC ANTIBODY LIBRARY, SAID LIBRARY AND APPLICATION(S) THEREOF | [2018/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'UNE BIBLIOTHÈQUE D'ANTICORPS SYNTHÉTIQUES, LADITE BIBLIOTHÈQUE ET SES APPLICATIONS | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 19.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2008053275 (MORPHOSYS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-18 * page 13 - page 14 ** page 49 - page 50 *; | [Y]WO2009036379 (ADIMAB INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * page 21, line 31 - line 33 * * page 50, line 20 - line 27 * * page 60, line 14 - line 16 * * examples 1-4 *; | [Y] - JOSEF PRASSLER ET AL, "HuCAL PLATINUM, a Synthetic Fab Library Optimized for Sequence Diversity and Superior Performance in Mammalian Expression Systems", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 413, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2011.08.012, ISSN 0022-2836, (20110805), pages 261 - 278, (20110812), XP028301349 [Y] 1-18 * page 263; table 1 * * page 267, paragraph bridging - page 268 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2011.08.012 | [Y] - WENWU ZHAI ET AL, "Synthetic Antibodies Designed on Natural Sequence Landscapes", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 412, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2011.07.018, ISSN 0022-2836, (20110711), pages 55 - 71, (20110720), XP028265958 [Y] 1-18 * page 57 - page 58; tables 1a,1b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2011.07.018 |