EP3408092 - COVER ASSEMBLY FOR AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD OF ITS MANUFACTURE, AND DEVICE COMPRISING THE COVER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2018/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Wei 1 Lexan Lane Mt. Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | 02 /
LAURIN, Michael M. 211 W Sepulveda Street Rear Unit San Pedro, California 90731 / US | 03 /
SUN, Xiaoyo 475 Creamery Way Exton, Pennsylvania 19341 / US | 04 /
CHOI, Jong-Min 1321 Seongnam-dearo Sujeong-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13109 / KR | 05 /
ALLESSIO, Timothy Michael 1 Lexan Lane Mount Vernon, Indiana 47620-9367 / US | [2018/49] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2018/49] | Application number, filing date | 17707999.3 | 27.01.2017 | [2018/49] | WO2017US15271 | Priority number, date | US201662288596P | 29.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662288596 P | US201662355393P | 28.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662355393 P | US201662375997P | 17.08.2016 Original published format: US 201662375997 P | US201662411133P | 21.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662411133 P | [2018/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017146866 | Date: | 31.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3408092 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B32B17/06 (EP);
B32B27/06 (EP,US);
B32B27/28 (EP,US);
B32B27/281 (EP,US);
B32B27/285 (EP,US);
B32B27/288 (EP,US);
B32B27/302 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,US);
B32B17/10174 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2255/00 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/20 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/538 (EP,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US);
B32B2307/558 (EP,US);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
B32B2367/00 (EP,US);
B32B2369/00 (EP,US);
B32B2457/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] | Title | German: | ABDECKUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VORRICHTUNG MIT DER ABDECKUNGSANORDNUNG | [2018/49] | English: | COVER ASSEMBLY FOR AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD OF ITS MANUFACTURE, AND DEVICE COMPRISING THE COVER ASSEMBLY | [2018/49] | French: | ENSEMBLE COUVERCLE POUR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET DISPOSITIF COMPRENANT L'ENSEMBLE COUVERCLE | [2018/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 25.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/37] | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 06.06.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9921708 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-12,14,15,18,19 * page 3, line 17 - line 27 * * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 4, line 7 - line 18 * * page 5, line 27 - line 37 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 13 * * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 16 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 27 * [Y] 1-20; | [XY]WO2007089270 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-9,12,14-19 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0033] , [0034] , [0036] - [0038] - [0041] , [0042] , [0054] * [Y] 1-20; | [XY]WO2012038170 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,9,12,14-19 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 13 * * page 5, line 5 - line 7 * * page 6, line 9 - line 10 * [Y] 1-20; | [XY]FR2969141 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [X] 1-9,11,14 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 11; claims 1,5,9 * * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 11 * * page 3, line 29 - line 34 * [Y] 1-20; | [Y]US2013076649 (MYERS SCOTT A [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0048] - [0061]; figures 4,5 *; | [XY]WO2016007743 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,9-18 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0023] , [0029] , [0052] , [0053] , [0057] , [0059]; claim 1; tables 3,4 * [Y] 1-20; | [Y] - -, "Technical Data 3M(TM) Optically Clear Adhesive 8146-x", (20131101), URL: http://multimedia.3m.com/mws/media/944360O/3mtm-optically-clear-adhesive-8146-x-series-tds.pdf, (20170420), XP055365725 [Y] 4 * the whole document * | [Y] - -, "Product Information ARclear 8932EE Optically Clear Unsupported Silicone Transfer Adhesive", (20140101), URL: http://www.adhesivesresearch.com/wp-content/uploads/2013/10/8932EE-Data-Sheet_1.pdf, (20170420), XP055365736 [Y] 4 * the whole document * | [T] - "ASTM D 1003-11 Standard Test Method for Haze and Luminous Transmittance of Transparent Plastics", ASTM DESIGNATION, ASTM INTERNATIONAL, US, (20110101), vol. ASTM D 1003-11, pages 223 - 229, XP009179395 [T] * the whole document * |