Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10829148 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | B2 | US2019002018 | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP54772 | 01.03.2017 | DE102016104090 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108602527B | Global Dossier | 23.03.2021 | B | CN108602527 | 28.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP54772 | 01.03.2017 | DE102016104090 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3426542 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2019 | B1 | EP3426542 | 16.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017EP54772 | 01.03.2017 | DE102016104090 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017153223 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016104090 | 07.03.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016104090 | 14.06.2017 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102016104090 | 07.03.2016 |