EP3295540 - STACK SYSTEM OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE, ELECTRIC MACHINE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE STACK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH&Co.Kommanditgesellschaft Ohmstrasse 2a 97076 Wuerzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH&Co. Kommanditgesellschaft Ohmstrasse 2a 97076 Wuerzburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PSZOLA, Peter Grimmgasse 86 53123 Bonn / DE | 02 /
PSZOLA, Moritz Grimmgasse 86 53123 Bonn / DE | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17708267.4 | 02.03.2017 | [2018/12] | WO2017EP54942 | Priority number, date | DE201610203739 | 08.03.2016 Original published format: DE102016203739 | [2018/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017153257 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3295540 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/02 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
H02K1/02 (EP);
H02K15/02 (EP);
H01F1/37 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] |
Former [2018/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PAKETSYSTEM EINER ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE, ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES PAKETSYSTEMS | [2018/12] | English: | STACK SYSTEM OF AN ELECTRIC MACHINE, ELECTRIC MACHINE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE STACK SYSTEM | [2018/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NOYAU D'UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE, MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT SYSTÈME DE NOYAU | [2018/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/44] | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014166674 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-33 * figure 2; claims 1, 2, 7 *; | [A]DE102011089417 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-33 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005]; figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE102005041676 |