EP3423090 - NOVEL INFLUENZA ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. Rue de l'Institut, 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASSILEV, Ventzislav Bojidarov GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals S.A. rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | West, Heloise GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 17708482.9 | 02.03.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017EP54843 | Priority number, date | GB20160003625 | 02.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201603625 | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017149054 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3423090 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3423090 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, A61K39/145, C07K14/005 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
A61K39/145 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/16 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE INFLUENZA-ANTIGENE | [2019/02] | English: | NOVEL INFLUENZA ANTIGENS | [2019/02] | French: | NOUVEAUX ANTIGÈNES DE LA GRIPPE | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 03.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2022 | 05.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY] - FLORIAN KRAMMER ET AL, "A Carboxy-Terminal Trimerization Domain Stabilizes Conformational Epitopes on the Stalk Domain of Soluble Recombinant Hemagglutinin Substrates", PLOS ONE, (20120823), vol. 7, no. 8, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0043603, page e43603, XP055181050 [X] 1,3-9,11,16,28 * page 2; figure 1B * [Y] 2,10,12-15,17-27,29,30 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0043603 | [Y] - SHUJUAN CUI ET AL, "Secretory expression of all 16 subtypes of the hemagglutinin 1 protein of influenza A virus in insect cells", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 177, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JVIROMET.2011.07.014, ISSN 0166-0934, (20110725), pages 160 - 167, (20110730), XP028297787 [Y] 1-30 * page 161; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jviromet.2011.07.014 | [YD] - R. HAI ET AL, "Influenza Viruses Expressing Chimeric Hemagglutinins: Globular Head and Stalk Domains Derived from Different Subtypes", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20120307), vol. 86, no. 10, doi:10.1128/JVI.00137-12, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 5774 - 5781, XP055100236 [YD] 1-30 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.00137-12 | Examination | US2008032921 | - TODD ARMSTRONG R ET AL, "The Transmembrane Domain of Influenza Hemagglutinin Exhibits a Stringent Length Requirement to Support the Hemifusion to Fusion Transition", vol. 151, no. 2, doi:10.1083/JCB.151.2.425, ISSN 0021-9525, (20001016), pages 425 - 437, THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, THE ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, URL: http://jcb.rupress.org/content/151/2/425.full.pdf+html, XP008160422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.151.2.425 | by applicant | WO9113281 | EP0516636 | EP0311863 | EP0382271 | WO9517210 | WO9633739 | US5650155 | US5667784 | WO9934850 | EP1092444 | - HAI ET AL., J. VIROL, (2012), vol. 86, no. 10, pages 5774 - 5781 | - WHITFORD ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 1393 - 1399 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning, A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR PRESS, (1989), vol. 1-3 | - REMETA ET AL., BIOCHEM., (2002), vol. 41, pages 2044 - 2054 | - J.M. WOOD ET AL., J. M M BIOL. STAND., (1977), vol. 5, pages 237 - 247 | - J. M. WOOD ET AL., J. BIOL. STAND., (1981), vol. 9, pages 317 - 330 | - BEYER ET AL., CLIN DRUG INVEST, (1998), vol. 15, page 1 | - MEIER ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 344, pages 1051 - 1069 | - GARGON ET AL., EXPERT. REV. VACCINES, (2012), vol. 11, pages 349 - 366 |