EP3593156 - A BATTERY STATE OF POWER ESTIMATION METHOD AND A BATTERY STATE MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Truck Corporation 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2020/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELSO, Esteban Björkhöjdsgatan 25 426 51 Göteborg / SE | [2020/03] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2020/03] | Application number, filing date | 17709043.8 | 06.03.2017 | [2020/03] | WO2017EP55132 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018162023 | Date: | 13.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3593156 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36, B60L11/18, H01M10/48, H02J7/00 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
G01R31/389 (US);
B60L3/0038 (EP);
B60L3/12 (EP);
B60L50/60 (EP,US);
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
G01R31/3647 (EP);
G01R31/3648 (US);
G01R31/367 (EP);
G01R31/3835 (EP,US);
H01M10/486 (EP,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP);
B60L2240/547 (EP);
G01R31/006 (EP);
G01R31/374 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DES BATTERIEZUSTANDS UND ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DEN BATTERIEZUSTAND | [2020/03] | English: | A BATTERY STATE OF POWER ESTIMATION METHOD AND A BATTERY STATE MONITORING SYSTEM | [2020/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE PUISSANCE D'ÉTAT DE BATTERIE ET SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE D'ÉTAT DE BATTERIE | [2020/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 01.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US2016131714 |