EP3423241 - ROBOTIC SERVICE DEVICE AND HANDLING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Herts AL10 9UL / GB | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STADIE, Robert Ocado Innovation Limited Legal Department Titan Court 3 Bishops Square, Hatfield Business Park Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | 02 /
INGRAM-TEDD, Andrew, John Ocado Innovation Limited Titan Court 3 Bishop Square Hatfield Business Park Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | 03 /
WHELAN, Matthew The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Herts AL10 9UL / GB | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Ocado Group IP Department The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/25] | Ocado Group IP Department The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield AL10 9UL / GB | ||
Former [2019/02] | Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor, et al c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 31 West Devon Business Park Brook Lane Tavistock, PL19 9DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 17709608.8 | 28.02.2017 | [2019/02] | WO2017EP54633 | Priority number, date | GB20160003520 | 29.02.2016 Original published format: GB 201603520 | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017148939 | Date: | 08.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3423241 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3423241 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B25J5/00, B65G1/04, B08B1/00, B08B5/04 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
B25J5/007 (EP,US);
B65G1/065 (GB,US);
B08B1/12 (US);
B08B3/02 (US);
B08B5/04 (US);
B60L53/00 (US);
B61B5/02 (US);
B61D15/00 (US);
B61F5/50 (US);
B61L23/04 (US);
B65G1/0414 (GB);
B65G1/0457 (GB);
B65G1/0464 (EP,GB,US);
B65G45/18 (US);
B65G45/22 (US);
B65G45/24 (US);
B66F9/06 (US);
B60L2200/26 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | B25J5/00, B65G1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTISCHE DIENSTVORRICHTUNG UND HANDHABUNGSVERFAHREN | [2019/02] | English: | ROBOTIC SERVICE DEVICE AND HANDLING METHOD | [2019/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERVICE ROBOTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MANIPULATION | [2019/02] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 14.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 07.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23172552.4 / EP4219086 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Request for further processing for: | 15.07.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.08.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | GR | 22.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2012043072 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [XA]US2012152877 (TADAYON SAIED [US]) [X] 1-3,13 * figures 1(a)-1(e),7 * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0121] * [A] 4,10,11; | [A]US2015148955 (CHIN HON WAH [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0064] *; | [YD]WO2015140216 (OCADO INNOVATION LTD [GB]) [YD] 1-13 * abstract * * claim - * * page 6, line 13 - line 21 * * page 7, line 24 - line 26 * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 6 * * page 8, line 20 - line 25 * * page 12, line 5 - line 9 *; | [Y] - FARSHAD ARVIN ET AL, "Swarm Robots Long Term Autonomy Using Moveable Charger", FUTURE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATION, 2009 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090403), ISBN 978-0-7695-3591-3, pages 127 - 130, XP031499482 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 128, column l, paragraph 2 * | [A] - TRUNG DUNG NGO ET AL, "Randomized Robot Trophallaxis: From concept to implementation", SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, 2007. ISIC. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENC E ON, IEEE, PI, (20071001), ISBN 978-1-4244-0990-7, pages 208 - 213, XP031198943 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2015019055 | WO2015140216 | WO2015185628 |