EP3426688 - SIGLEC NEUTRALIZING ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innate Pharma 117, Avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORNEN, Stéphanie 11 Chemin Vallon de Ruissatel 13011 Marseille / FR | 02 /
ROSSI, Benjamin Résidence la Palmeraie Bât C 70 Avenue d'Haifa 13008 Marseille / FR | 03 /
WAGTMANN, Nicolai 1776 Monument Street Concord, MA 01742 / US | [2019/07] |
Former [2019/03] | 01 /
CORNEN, Stéphanie Résidence Valmante Michelet Bat B1 109 Traverse de la Gouffonne 13009 Marseille / FR | ||
02 /
ROSSI, Benjamin Résidence la Palmeraie Bât C 70 Avenue d'Haifa 13008 Marseille / FR | |||
03 /
WAGTMANN, Nicolai 16 Avenue Joseph Liautaud 13260 Cassis / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Völlmy, Lukas Innate Pharma IP Department 117, avenue de Luminy 13009 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 17709646.8 | 07.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017EP55364 | Priority number, date | US201662304957P | 08.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662304957 P | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017153433 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3426688 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6801 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C12N5/12 (US);
G01N33/574 (KR);
G01N33/57484 (US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Extension states | BA | 08.10.2018 | ME | 08.10.2018 | Title | German: | SIGLEC-NEUTRALISIERENDE ANTIKÖRPER | [2019/03] | English: | SIGLEC NEUTRALIZING ANTIBODIES | [2019/03] | French: | ANTICORPS NEUTRALISANT LES SIGLECS | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 08.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.06.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007049044 (UNIV DUNDEE [GB], et al) [X] 23,31 * page 21, line 5 - line 8 * * page 35, line 19 - line 22 * * page 30, line 7 - page 31, line 15 * * page 17, line 23 * * page 19, line 10 - line 13 *; | [XI] - CAMILLA JANDUS ET AL, "Interactions between Siglec-7/9 receptors and ligands influence NK cell-dependent tumor immunosurveillance", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, (20140224), vol. 124, no. 4, doi:10.1172/JCI65899, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 1810 - 1820, XP055342636 [X] 1,5-13,15-24,29,30,33,34,40,41,48-51 * page 1811, column r, paragraph 4 * * figures 3A-3B * * page 1813, column l * [I] 25,27,28,32,35-39,42-44,46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI65899 | [X] - JASON E HUDAK ET AL, "Glycocalyx engineering reveals a Siglec-based mechanism for NK cell immunoevasion", NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, Basingstoke, (20131124), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1038/nchembio.1388, ISSN 1552-4450, pages 69 - 75, XP055312199 [X] 1,5-13,15-24,29,30,33,34,40,41,48-51 * page 71, column r, paragraph 2 * * figure 3 * * online methods: "reagents and antibodies" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchembio.1388 | [X] - Aaron F Carlin ET AL, "PHAGOCYTES, GRANULOCYTES, AND MYELOPOIESIS Molecular mimicry of host sialylated glycans allows a bacterial pathogen to engage neutrophil Siglec-9 and dampen the innate immune response", Blood, doi:10.1182/blood-2008-11-, (20090101), pages 3333 - 3336, URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/113/14/3333.full.pdf, (20170512), XP055372312 [X] 1,5-13,15-24,29,30,33,34,40,41,48-51 * page 3335, column l, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2008-11- | [XI] - HEINZ LÄUBLI ET AL, "Engagement of myelomonocytic Siglecs by tumor-associated ligands modulates the innate immune response to cancer", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES PNAS, US, (20140915), vol. 111, no. 39, doi:10.1073/pnas.1409580111, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14211 - 14216, XP055372314 [X] 1,5-13,15-24,29,30,33,34,40-44,48-51 * page 14212, column r, paragraph 3 * [I] 25,27,28,32,35-39,42-44,46 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1409580111 | [A] - C Jandus ET AL, "Interactions between Siglec-7/9 receptors and ligands influence NK cell-dependent tumor immunosurveillance- Supplemental figures", The Journal of Clinical Investigation, (20140401), pages 1 - 14, URL: https://dm5migu4zj3pb.cloudfront.net/manuscripts/65000/65899/JCI65899sd.pdf, (20170511), XP055371656 [A] 1,5-13,15-25,27-44,46,48-51 * figure 7A * | [A] - JASON E HUDAK ET AL, "Glycocalyx engineering reveals a Siglec-based mechanism for NK cell immunoevasion-Supplementary information", NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, Basingstoke, (20131124), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1038/nchembio.1388, ISSN 1552-4450, pages S1 - S21, XP055372305 [A] 1,5-13,15-25,27-44,46,48-51 * "reagents and antibodies" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchembio.1388 | [A] - Heinz Läubli ET AL, "Supplementary Information Läubli et al, Engagement of Myelomonocytic Siglecs by Tumor-associated Ligands Modulates the Innate Immune Response to Cancer", (20140930), pages 1 - 22, URL: http://www.pnas.org/content/suppl/2014/09/15/1409580111.DCSupplemental/pnas.1409580111.sapp.pdf, (20170512), XP055372364 [A] 1,5-13,15-25,27-44,46,48-51 * figures S1, S6, S10 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * | [A] - STEPHAN VON GUNTEN ET AL, "Basic and Clinical Immunology of Siglecs", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20081101), vol. 1143, no. 1, doi:10.1196/annals.1443.011, ISSN 0077-8923, pages 61 - 82, XP055372327 [A] 1,5-13,15-25,27-44,46,48-51 * page 72, column r, paragraph 2 - page 73, column r, paragraph 3 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1196/annals.1443.011 | by applicant | US4816567 | US5229275 | US5567610 | US5660827 | US6162963 | WO03101485 | US6737056 | WO2006121168 | WO2007005874 | WO2008156712 | WO2009014708 | EP1238282 | WO2009101611 | WO2009114335 | WO2010077634 | WO2011066501 | WO2011066389 | WO2012065950 | WO2012145493 | US2013034559 | WO2013019906 | WO2015085847 | - SIG792 PCT_ST25 TXT | - LANIER, ANNUAL REVIEW OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, pages 225 - 74 | - WAGTMANN ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 5, pages 439 - 449 | - ANGATA ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, pages 22127 - 22135 | - ZHANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, no. 29, pages 22121 - 22126 | - LAUBLI ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2014), vol. 111, no. 39, pages 14211 - 14216 | - CARLIN ET AL., BLOOD, (2009), vol. 113, pages 3333 - 3336 | - VITALE ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 96, no. 26, pages 15091 - 96 | - FALCO ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1999), vol. 190, pages 793 - 801 | - HUDAK ET AL., NAT. CHEM. BIOL., (2014), vol. 10, pages 69 - 77 | - JANDUS ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2014), vol. 124, no. 4, pages 1810 - 18020 | - ANGATA; VARKI, GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 431 - 438 | - ANGATA; VARKI, J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, no. 29, pages 22127 - 22135 | - MULLER, METH. ENZYMOL., (1983), vol. 92, pages 589 - 601 | - GREEN ET AL., NATURE GENET, (1994), vol. 7, page 13 | - LONBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, page 856 | - TAYLOR ET AL., INT IMMUN, (1994), vol. 6, page 579 | - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 553 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL, (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - CARILLO ET AL., SIAM J. APPLIED MATH., (1988), vol. 48, page 1073 | - DEVEREUX ET AL., NUCL. ACID. RES., (1984), vol. 12, page 387 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., BLAST Manual, NCB/NLM/NIH | - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103 | - Antibody Purification Handbook, BIOSCIENCES | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, page 544 | - SKERRA ET AL., CURR. OPINION IN IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 5, page 256 | - PLUCKTHUN, IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 130, page 151 | - SAUNAL, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1995), vol. 183, pages 33 - 41 | - EHRING H, ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 267, no. 2, pages 252 - 259 | - ENGEN, J. R.; SMITH, D. L., ANAL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 73, pages 256A - 265A | - RES FOUND WORKSHOP, (2004), pages 149 - 67 | - HUANG ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 281, no. 1, pages 61 - 67 | - SAITO; PATTERSON, METHODS, (199606), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 516 - 24 | - DOWNARD, J MASS SPECTROM., (200004), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 493 - 503 | - KISELAR; DOWNARD, ANAL CHEM., (19990501), vol. 71, no. 9, pages 1792 - 1801 | - CLACKSON; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, pages 383 - 386 | - WELLS, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 1 - 6 | - WANG ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 355, pages 275 - 278 | - FAGERSTAM ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR RECOGNITION, (1990), vol. 3, pages 208 - 14 | - NICE ET AL., J. CHROMA-TOGR., (1993), vol. 646, pages 159 - 168 | - LEIPERT ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (1998), vol. 37, pages 3308 - 3311 | - KROGER ET AL., BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, (2002), vol. 17, pages 937 - 944 | - SIVORI ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1997), vol. 186, pages 1129 - 1136 | - VITALE ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1998), vol. 187, pages 2065 - 2072 | - PESSINO ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1998), vol. 188, pages 953 - 960 | - NERI ET AL., CLIN. DIAG. LAB. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 8, pages 1131 - 1135 | - PENDE ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1999), vol. 190, pages 1505 - 1516 | - MORRISON ET AL., PNAS, (1984), page 6851 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, page 522 | - REICHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323 | - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, page 593 | - VERHOEYEN, SCIENCE, vol. 239, page 1534 | - SIMS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2296 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL., (1987), vol. 196, page 901 | - CARTER ET AL., PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, page 4285 | - PRESTA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2623 | - JAKOBOVITZ ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, page 255 | - STROHL, W., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2009), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 685 - 691 | - BAUDINO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 181, pages 6664 - 69 | - KOHRT ET AL., BLOOD, (2011), vol. 117, no. 8, pages 2423 - 2432 | - BORK ET AL., J PHARM SCI., (200910), vol. 98, no. 10, pages 3499 - 508 | - GLAVEY ET AL., BLOOD, (20140911), vol. 124, no. 11, pages 1765 - 76 | - CHONG ET AL., NATL CANCER INST., (20151107), vol. 108, no. 2 | - ANTONY ET AL., BMC CANCER, (20141202), vol. 14, page 901 | - RILLAHAN ET AL., ACS CHEM BIOL., (20130719), vol. 8, no. 7, pages 1417 - 22 | - ALPHEY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 5, pages 3372 - 3377 | WO2015EP70550 |