EP3427544 - CONTROLLABLE POWER AND LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Growth Solutions Limited The James Hutton Institute Invergowrie Dundee DD2 5DA / GB | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYKROYD, Henry c/o Intelligent Growth Solutions Limited The James Hutton Institute Invergowrie Dundee DD2 5DA / GB | 02 /
SCOTT, David c/o Intelligent Growth Solutions Limited The James Hutton Institute Invergowrie Dundee DD2 5DA / GB | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | Application number, filing date | 17709763.1 | 02.03.2017 | [2019/03] | WO2017GB50562 | Priority number, date | GB20160003904 | 07.03.2016 Original published format: GB 201603904 | GB20160008529 | 16.05.2016 Original published format: GB 201608529 | GB20170000932 | 19.01.2017 Original published format: GB 201700932 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017153719 | Date: | 14.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3427544 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H05B45/3725 (EP,US);
H05B45/37 (GB,KR);
F21S4/28 (US);
H01R25/147 (US);
H05B45/24 (RU,US);
H05B47/185 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/03] | Title | German: | STEUERBARES ENERGIE- UND BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2019/03] | English: | CONTROLLABLE POWER AND LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2019/03] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION ET D'ÉCLAIRAGE CONTRÔLABLE | [2019/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/03] | 04.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2010041169 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [XI]EP2568773 (YANG TAI-HER [TW]); | [XI]EP2840693 (WLADYSLAW WLODARCZYK IGLOO [PL]); | [A]GB2527955 (INTELLIGENT GROWTH SOLUTIONS LTD [GB]) |